Cortes et al v. Corned Beef Express, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Lara Torres, Carlos Clemente Maximino, Miguel Pano Serrano, Beatriz Corona Cortes, Venancio Saldana Villanueva, Francisco Javier Garcia Santos, Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax and Jose Ortiz Garcia
Defendant: John Doe Corp., Corned Beef Express, LLC, Avatar Singh, Arun Kumar, Walter Singh and M A K Food Group Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv03546
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M A K Food Group Inc..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Avatar Singh..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arun Kumar..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Doe Corp...(pc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walter Singh..(pc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arun Kumar, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Avatar Singh, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walter Singh, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M A K Food Group Inc, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Doe Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corned Beef Express, LLC..(pne)
May 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
May 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Antonio Faillace to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,,, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,,, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,,, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,,, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): enter the full name of the first listed plaintiff on summons request caption; one summons request can be filed with an appendix/addendum attached listing the defendant's names and addresses. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
May 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arun Kumar, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pne).
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Avatar Singh, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pne).
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walter Singh, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pne).
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Doe Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pne).
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M A K Food Group Inc, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pne).
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Corned Beef Express, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corned Beef Express, LLC, John Doe Corp., Arun Kumar, M A K Food Group Inc, Avatar Singh, Walter Singh. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19730874)Document filed by Miguel Pano Serrano(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(individually), Beatriz Corona Cortes(on behalf of others similarly situated), Beatriz Corona Cortes(individually), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(individually), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(individually), Jose Ortiz Garcia(individually), Miguel Pano Serrano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax(on behalf of others similarly situated), Venancio Saldana Villanueva(individually), Jose Luis Lara Torres(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos Clemente Maximino(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Ortiz Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Francisco Javier Garcia Santos(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes et al v. Corned Beef Express, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Lara Torres
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Clemente Maximino
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Pano Serrano
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Corona Cortes
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venancio Saldana Villanueva
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Garcia Santos
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Alejandro Tzuban Tax
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ortiz Garcia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corned Beef Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avatar Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arun Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M A K Food Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?