Ragland v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ragland
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-10, P.O. Brian Wilkens, City of New York and Brian Wilkens
Case Number: 1:2020cv03556
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Edmund Schemitsch on behalf of City of New York..(Schemitsch, John)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint, served. City of New York served on 6/5/2020. Document filed by Michael Ragland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service of Process Email to City).(DePaola, Samuel)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/14/2020) (jwh)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, Brian Wilkens..(pne)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York and Brian Wilkens, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Ragland..(DePaola, Samuel)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York and Brian Wilkens, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Ragland..(DePaola, Samuel) Modified on 5/14/2020 (pne).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Samuel Christopher DePaola to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the attorney information was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York and Brian Wilkens, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Ragland..(DePaola, Samuel) Modified on 5/12/2020 (jgo).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael Ragland..(DePaola, Samuel)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(DePaola, Samuel)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information..(rpr)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Samuel Christopher DePaola. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Samuel Christopher DePaola. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: P.O. Brian Wilkens. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, John or Jane Does 1-10, Brian Wilkens. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19735447)Document filed by Michael Ragland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NYT Articles re: NYPD corruption and false statements).(DePaola, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragland v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Brian Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: John Edmund Schemitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ragland
Represented By: Samuel Christopher DePaola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?