Pacific Western Bank v. Williams
Plaintiff: Pacific Western Bank
Defendant: Stephen J Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv03563
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER terminating #15 Letter Motion for Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall be referred for a settlement conference before Judge Freeman. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 2, 2020, is adjourned sine die, while the parties participate in settlement efforts. A referral order will issue separately. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket No. 15. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/30/2020) (cf)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/30/2020) (cf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Martin Eisenberg, Esq dated June 29, 2020 re: #15 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Martin Eisenberg, Esq dated June 17, 2020. Opposition to Plaintiff's Request For Permission to File SJ Motion. Document filed by Stephen J Williams..(Eisenberg, Martin)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for James W. Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Stephanie P. Calnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from James W. Stoll and Martin Eisenberg dated June 25, 2020 re: court's order [dkt. 7] and attaching proposed civil case management plan and scheduling order. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Stoll, James)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from James W. Stoll dated June 22, 2020 re: in response to Defendants' 6/17/2020 letter and request permission to file a motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank..(Stoll, James)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Martin Eisenberg, Esq dated June 17, 2020. filed by Stephen J Williams, ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file a response to this letter by June 25, 2020, in accordance with Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2. The letters will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 2, 2020, at 10:50 a.m. The parties are reminded that, per the Order at Dkt. No. 7, their pre-conference materials are due at least seven days before the conference, or by June 25, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/18/2020) ( Responses due by 6/25/2020) (ks)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Martin Eisenberg, Esq dated June 17, 2020. Document filed by Stephen J Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guarantee).(Eisenberg, Martin)
June 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for James W. Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20284125. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Stephanie P. Calnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20284093. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Stephanie P. Calnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20284093. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #14 MOTION for James W. Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20284125. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The documents have been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for James W. Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20284125. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James W. Stoll in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of James W. Stoll, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Stoll, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Stephanie P. Calnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20284093. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephanie P. Calnan in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Calnan Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Calnan, Stephanie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Errata re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Stoll, James)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned that: 1. Defendant Stephen J. Williams' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this case is extended through and including June 30, 2020. 2. No provision in this Stipulation shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendant expressly reserves, any and all defenses. SO ORDERED. Stephen J Williams answer due 6/30/2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/26/2020) (jca)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Martin Eisenberg, Esq dated May 22, 2020. Document filed by Stephen J Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation).(Eisenberg, Martin)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Eisenberg on behalf of Stephen J Williams..(Eisenberg, Martin)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order (ECF No. 7) served on Stephen J. Williams on 5/18/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Stoll, James)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/18/2020) (cf)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Stephen J Williams served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certified Mail Receipt)).(Stoll, James)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen J Williams..(jgo)
May 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent PacWest Bancorp for Pacific Western Bank. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank..(Stoll, James)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen J. Williams, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pacific Western Bank..(Stoll, James)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stoll, James)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen J Williams. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19743719)Document filed by Pacific Western Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Stoll, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Western Bank v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Williams
Represented By: Martin Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Western Bank
Represented By: James William Stoll
Represented By: Stephanie Calnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?