Aenergy, S.A. et al v. Republic of Angola et al
Plaintiff: Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A. and Aenergy, S.A.
Defendant: Empresa Nacional De Distribuicao De Electricidade, General Electric Company, Ministry of Energy and Water of the Republic of Angola, Republic of Angola, Ministry of Finance of the Republic of Angola, Empresa Publica De Producao De Electricidade, EP, General Electric International, Inc. and GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03569
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for SAMUEL LIVERSIDGE to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20529574. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
July 2, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for SAMUEL LIVERSIDGE to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20529574. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Samuel Liversidge, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Liversidge, Samuel)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Complaint #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc. answer due 7/29/2020; General Electric Company answer due 7/29/2020; General Electric International, Inc. answer due 7/29/2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/21/2020) (jca)
June 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Manning Danner on behalf of Aenergy, S.A., Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A...(Danner, Scott)
June 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Taylor Goldman on behalf of Aenergy, S.A., Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A...(Goldman, Brian)
June 11, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Complaint,,, #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Orin Snyder dated June 11, 2020. Document filed by GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc...(Snyder, Orin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent and no publicly held coporation owns 10 percent or more of its stock for General Electric Company; Corporate Parent GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY for GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric International, Inc.. Document filed by GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc...(Snyder, Orin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Orin Snyder on behalf of GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc...(Snyder, Orin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Marie Champion on behalf of GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc...(Champion, Anne)
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilissa Stacy Samplin on behalf of GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc...(Samplin, Ilissa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, (along with attached affidavit of translator and Portuguese translations of the above documents) mailed to Empresa Publica de Producao de Electricidade, EP Gaveto entre a Entrada do Camama e Via Expresso Proximo ao centra de producao de TPA Luanda, Angola on 6/9/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7705 2391 7905, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B)..(smc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, (along with attached affidavit of translator and Portuguese translations of the above documents) mailed to Empresa Publica de Producao de Electricidade Headquarters Buildings, Ngola Kiluange Rua Conego Manuela das Neves no.234 Luanda, Angola on 6/9/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7705 2381 8379, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B). (smc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Notice of Suit, Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, Copy of Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, Individual Rules of Judge Alison J. Nathan and Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions (along with attached affidavit of translator and Portuguese translations of the above documents) mailed to Ministry of Energy and Water of the Republic of Angola Republic of Angola Ministry of Foreign Affairs Tete Antonio, Minister Edificio do Mirex, RUA Major Kanhangulo n. Baxia/Luanda, Angola on 6/9/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7705 2334 4291, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3)..(smc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Notice of Suit, Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, Copy of Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, Individual Rules of Judge Alison J. Nathan and Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions (along with attached affidavit of translator and Portuguese translations of the above documents) mailed to Republic of Angola Ministry of Foreign Affairs Tete Antonio, Minister Edificio do Mirex, RUA Major Kanhangulo n. Baxia/Luanda, Angola on 6/9/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7705 2367 3311, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (smc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Notice of Suit, Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, Copy of Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, Individual Rules of Judge Alison J. Nathan and Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions (along with attached affidavit of translator and Portuguese translations of the above documents) mailed to Ministry of Finance of Republic of Angola Republic of Angola Ministry of Foreign Affairs Tete Antonio, Minister Edificio do Mirex, RUA Major Kanhangulo n. Baxia/Luanda, Angola on 6/9/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7705 2370 3650, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of ForeignServices Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (smc)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/21/2020) (cf)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Empresa Nacional De Distribuicao De Electricidade, Empresa Publica De Producao De Electricidade, EP, GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc., Ministry of Energy and Water of the Republic of Angola, Ministry of Finance of the Republic of Angola, Republic of Angola. Document filed by Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A., Aenergy, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part One, #2 Exhibit 1 Part Two, #3 Exhibit 1 Part Three, #4 Exhibit 1 Part Four, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20).(Levy, Vincent)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Vincent Levy dated May 20, 2020 re: Complaint. Document filed by Aenergy, S.A., Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A...(Levy, Vincent)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David Z. Pinsky dated May 19, 2020 re: Sealed Complaint. Document filed by GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc...(Pinsky, David)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
May 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
May 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
May 7, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Empresa Nacional De Distribuicao De Electricidade, Empresa Publica De Producao De Electricidade, EP, GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc., Ministry of Energy and Water of the Republic of Angola, Ministry of Finance of the Republic of Angola, Republic of Angola. (laq)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS PROVISIONALLY UNDER SEAL AND WITH REDACTIONS. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni, Part One on 5/7/2020) (laq)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Vincent Levy in Support re: #4 PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS PROVISIONALLY UNDER SEAL AND WITH REDACTIONS. Document filed by Aenergy, S.A., Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A.. (laq) (laq).
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS PROVISIONALLY UNDER SEAL AND WITH REDACTIONS. Document filed by Aenergy, S.A., Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A.(laq)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19mc542. Document filed by Aenergy, S.A., Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A.(laq)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT against Empresa Nacional De Distribuicao De Electricidade, Empresa Publica De Producao De Electricidade, EP, GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc., General Electric Company, General Electric International, Inc., Ministry of Energy and Water of the Republic of Angola, Ministry of Finance of the Republic of Angola. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401258367)Document filed by Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A., Aenergy, S.A. (Attachments: #1 cmp part two)(laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aenergy, S.A. et al v. Republic of Angola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empresa Nacional De Distribuicao De Electricidade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Samuel Liversidge
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Ilissa Stacy Samplin
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ministry of Energy and Water of the Republic of Angola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic of Angola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ministry of Finance of the Republic of Angola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empresa Publica De Producao De Electricidade, EP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric International, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Liversidge
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Ilissa Stacy Samplin
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Capital EFS Financing, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Liversidge
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Ilissa Stacy Samplin
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combined Cycle Power Plant Soyo, S.A.
Represented By: Vincent Gregory Levy
Represented By: Brian Taylor Goldman
Represented By: Scott Manning Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aenergy, S.A.
Represented By: Vincent Gregory Levy
Represented By: Brian Taylor Goldman
Represented By: Scott Manning Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?