Xia et al v. 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Paul Privitera and Eva Xia
Defendant: 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Samantha Pinkowitz, Christine Elbert, Angela Rojo and Anthony Sarmiento
Case Number: 1:2020cv03576
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Conference. An initial conference will be held at the time of the July 7 telephonic pre-motion conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
June 25, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #19 Letter, opposing Defendants' pre-motion letter and requesting that an initial pretrial conference be held in conjunction with the July 7, 2020 pre-motion conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David A. Lebowitz dated June 25, 2020. Document filed by Paul Privitera, Eva Xia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/24/20 Email to UHAB, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order).(Lebowitz, David)
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter, filed by 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Angela Rojo, Anthony Sarmiento, Christine Elbert. ENDORSEMENT: A telephonic pre-motion conference will be held on July 7, 2020, at 10:30 AM. Plaintiffs are directed to respond by June 29, 2020. The parties may call the Court at (877) 411-9748; Access Code: 3029857. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/19/2020) (mro)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jennifer Stewart dated June 17, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Christine Elbert, Angela Rojo, Anthony Sarmiento..(Stewart, Jennifer)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT SAMANTHA PINKOWITZ. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiffs Eva Xia and Paul Privitera hereby dismiss their claims in this action against Defendant Samantha Pinkowitz without prejudice. Defendant Pinkowitz has filed neither an answer or motion for summary judgment, and therefore dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) is appropriate. So ordered. Samantha Pinkowitz terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/12/2020) (rjm)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Edgardo Ramos for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (ad)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Samantha Pinkowitz. Document filed by Eva Xia, Paul Privitera. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kaufman, Alanna)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alanna Gayle Kaufman on behalf of Paul Privitera, Eva Xia..(Kaufman, Alanna)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted. 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation answer due 6/17/2020; Christine Elbert answer due 6/17/2020; Samantha Pinkowitz answer due 6/17/2020; Angela Rojo answer due 6/17/2020; Anthony Sarmiento answer due 6/17/2020. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/4/2020) (mro)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jennifer Stewart dated June 3, 2020. Document filed by 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Christine Elbert, Samantha Pinkowitz, Angela Rojo, Anthony Sarmiento..(Stewart, Jennifer)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lee Stewart on behalf of 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Christine Elbert, Samantha Pinkowitz, Angela Rojo, Anthony Sarmiento..(Stewart, Jennifer)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Aiello on behalf of 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Christine Elbert, Samantha Pinkowitz, Angela Rojo, Anthony Sarmiento..(Aiello, Jacqueline)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A Lebowitz on behalf of Paul Privitera, Eva Xia..(Lebowitz, David)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew David Stern on behalf of Eva Xia..(Stern, Andrew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Registered Agent, Sec. of State of NY. Document filed by Eva Xia..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Anthony Sarmiento served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Anthony Sarmiento. Document filed by Eva Xia..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Samantha Pinkowitz served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Samantha Pinkowitz. Document filed by Eva Xia..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Angela Rojo served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Doe. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eva Xia..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Christine Elbert served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Christine Elbert. Document filed by Eva Xia..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Christine Elbert, Samantha Pinkowitz, Paul Privitera, Angela Rojo, Anthony Sarmiento..(pc)
May 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19760789..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Moshe Chaim Bobker. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 5/13/2020..(pc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 65 WEST 87TH STREET HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND CORPORATION, CHRISTINE ELBERT, SAMANTHA PINKOWITZ, ANTHONY SARMIENTO, and ANGELA ROJO, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Privitera, Eva Xia..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bobker, Moshe)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation, Christine Elbert, Samantha Pinkowitz, Angela Rojo, Anthony Sarmiento. (Filing Fee $ 400.00.)Document filed by Eva Xia, Paul Privitera..(Bobker, Moshe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xia et al v. 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 65 West 87th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Stewart
Represented By: Jacqueline Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Pinkowitz
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Stewart
Represented By: Jacqueline Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Elbert
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Stewart
Represented By: Jacqueline Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Rojo
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Stewart
Represented By: Jacqueline Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Sarmiento
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Stewart
Represented By: Jacqueline Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Privitera
Represented By: Moshe Chaim Bobker
Represented By: Alanna Gayle Kaufman
Represented By: David A Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Xia
Represented By: Moshe Chaim Bobker
Represented By: Alanna Gayle Kaufman
Represented By: David A Lebowitz
Represented By: Andrew David Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?