Roberson v Clearview AI, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shelby Zelonis Roberson
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03705
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:20-cv-1296. (sjo)
May 13, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
May 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 13, 2020 Filing 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number: 1:20-cv-00111. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 12, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Transfer #12 is GRANTED to the extent that Defendant requests that the Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED as moot to the extent that Defendantrequests this Court to stay the proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/12/2020. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including thirty days after the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer within which to file its response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 05/06/20. (cmar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay /Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer filed by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion to Extend Deadline for Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue and Stay Case. Defendant shall have up to and including May 4, 2020 within which to file itsreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 04/27/20. (cmar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of re #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay /Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 and Stay Case Pending Decision on /Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Clearview AI, Inc. (Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay /Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Shelby Zelonis Roberson re #16 Memorandum in Opposition, (Notice of Additional Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (SDNY Order dated April 22, 2020))(Webster, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay /Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer filed by Shelby Zelonis Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Webster, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Larson, Jan) (Main Document 15 replaced on 4/7/2020) (dvanm, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 Waiver of re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay /Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer /Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Clearview AI, Inc. (Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay /Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer filed by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Mulcaire)(Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case , MOTION to Stay /Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Transfer), #2 Proposed Order (Stay))(Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Lee S. Wolosky. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/2/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael W. Ross. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/2/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have up to and including May 14, 2020 within which to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 02/26/20. (cmar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lee S. Wolosky and Certification of Local Counsel Jan A. Larson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7092053. by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael W. Ross and Certification of Local Counsel Jan A. Larson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7092026. by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Clearview AI, Inc. re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint / Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Amber Larson on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc. (Larson, Jan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clearview AI, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Shelby Zelonis Roberson. (Webster, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7053040.), filed by Shelby Zelonis Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webster, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v Clearview AI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Zelonis Roberson
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Represented By: Jan Amber Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?