Chamani v. Quasar Mining Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronit Chamani
Defendant: Nicholas Gubitosi, Paul Tyree and Quasar Mining Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03874
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Nevada; Case Number: 2:20-cv-00077. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
May 19, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
May 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Transferring Case to the Southern District of NewYork. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
April 12, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Ronit Chamani. (VerStandig, Maurice) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation; Re: #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) And Proposed Order Extending Briefing Schedule re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Ronit Chamani. (VerStandig, Maurice) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendants Nicholas Gubitosi, Quasar Mining Group Inc., Paul Tyree. Replies due by 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Nicholas Gubitosi) (Kay, Rory) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Sareen K Armani and approving Designation of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/18/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice for Jack Yoskowitz Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/18/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jack Yoskowitz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5931227) by Defendants Nicholas Gubitosi, Quasar Mining Group Inc., Paul Tyree. (Kay, Rory) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sareen K. Armani and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5931207) by Defendants Nicholas Gubitosi, Quasar Mining Group Inc., Paul Tyree. (Kay, Rory) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation; Re: #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 3/25/2020. Replies due by 4/8/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jack Yoskowitz and Sareen K. Armani to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/19/2020. (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and (Proposed) Order Extending Briefing Schedule re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendants Nicholas Gubitosi, Quasar Mining Group Inc., Paul Tyree. (Kay, Rory) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ronit Chamani. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ronit Chamani, #2 Exhibit B - SAFT Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Form D Filing, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Form D Filing, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail from William Alex Foxen, #6 Exhibit F - Release) (VerStandig, Maurice) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronit Chamani re #2 Summons Issued. Nicholas Gubitosi waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (VerStandig, Maurice) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronit Chamani. Paul Tyree waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (VerStandig, Maurice) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronit Chamani re #2 Summons Issued. Quasar Mining Group Inc. waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (VerStandig, Maurice) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronit Chamani that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate THE VERSTANDIG LAW FIRM, LLC, Other Affiliate Jessica Dawley for Ronit Chamani added. (VerStandig, Maurice) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/2020. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than January 16, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicholas Gubitosi, Quasar Mining Group Inc., Paul Tyree (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5843084) by Ronit Chamani. Proof of service due by 4/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (VerStandig, Maurice) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamani v. Quasar Mining Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Gubitosi
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Represented By: Sareen Karla Armani
Represented By: Rory T Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Tyree
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Represented By: Sareen Karla Armani
Represented By: Rory T Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quasar Mining Group Inc.
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Represented By: Sareen Karla Armani
Represented By: Rory T Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronit Chamani
Represented By: Maurice Belmont VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?