Nunes v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Devin G. Nunes
Defendant: Cable News Network Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv03976
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
May 22, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
May 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
May 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number: 3:19-cv-00889. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 22, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Original file, Copy of Transfer Order, and Docket Report sent. (sbea,) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the Defendant Cable News Network, Inc.'s MOTION TO TRANSFER (ECF No. #14 ) is granted. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this action to the Southern District of New York. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/21/2020. (sbea,) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. See Opinion for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/21/2020. (sbea,) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven) Modified docket text on 3/3/2020 (jsau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Cable News Network, Inc..(Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven) Modified docket text on 2/21/2020 (jsau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that: (1) The Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT #13 is DENIED AS MOOT; (2) The Defendant shall file its answer and motion to dismiss by February 21, 2020; (3) The Plaintiff shall file a response brief by March 2, 2020; (4) The Defendant shall file a reply brief by March 12, 2020; (5) The Plaintiff shall also file a response brief to the Defendant's MOTION TO TRANSFER #14 by February 20, 2020; and (6) The Defendant shall file a reply brief by February 28, 2020. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/12/20. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 2/11/2020. (Court Reporter Peppy Peterson, OCR.) (nbrow) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cable News Network, Inc., filed by Devin G. Nunes.(Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Kevin T. Baine to appear Pro hac vice for Cable News Network, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/22/20. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Filing attorney notified of correct procedures when filing a Motion and Memorandum in Support. Attorney directed to re-file the Memorandum for each motion and link each document back to the correct Motion. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin T. Baine and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7031158. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Stephen Fuzesi to appear Pro hac vice for Cable News Network, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/30/19. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND #9 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by January 17, 2020. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/20/19. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Cable News Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) Modified docket text on 12/19/2019 (jsau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Fuzesi and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6992082. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Hal Butswinkas on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc. (Butswinkas, Dane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin G. Nunes Cable News Network, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019 (Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cable News Network, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6966149.), filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2019) (tjoh, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network Inc
Represented By: Stephen Fuzesi
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Diane H. Butswinkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin G. Nunes
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?