Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Pieoneers Software, Inc.
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Pieoneers Software, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04025
Filed: May 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pieoneers Software, Inc...(pc)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pieoneers Software, Inc., re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Pieoneers Software, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Email, #4 Exhibit Email, #5 Exhibit Email).(Garbarini, Richard)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: This case, involving claims under the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. 101 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving copyright claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference, the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests that a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned. To facilitate prompt mediation, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff: to file proof of service no more than three days after service has been effected; and to produce to Defendant(s), by the earlier of 1) 14 days after service of process or 2) three business days in advance of any mediation session, copies of records sufficient to show the royalty paid the last three times the picture that is at issue in this case was licensed, as well as the number of times the picture was licensed in the last five years; if the picture at issue has never been licensed, Plaintiff must expressly certify that fact to Defendant(s) as part of Plaintiff's production. Defendant(s) are directed to file a notice of appearance within 14 days of the service of process. The Court further directs that, upon a Defendant's timely filing of a notice of appearance, the deadline for that Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall beextended until 30 days after the conclusion of all Mediation in this case. If Plaintiff has effected service on a Defendant, and that Defendant has failed to appear in the case or respond to the Complaint, Plaintiff must move for a default judgment against that Defendant in accordance with this Court's Individual Practices no later than 45 days after the date of the service of the Complaint. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/8/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/28/2020) (ama)
May 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff name on caption contains a typographical error (Photographhy). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pne)
May 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
May 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
May 24, 2020 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard)
May 24, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pieoneers Software, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 5/26/2020 (pne).
May 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard)
May 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pieoneers Software, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19956816)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration).(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Pieoneers Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pieoneers Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?