Irving H. Picard v.Marlene Krauss
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Defendant: Marlene Krauss
In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04086
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Referring Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 9/8/2020. Motions due by 8/18/2020. Responses due by 9/29/2020 Replies due by 10/6/2020. (ks)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER terminating #7 Motion for Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall brief Plaintiff's proposed motion for summary judgment and Defendants proposed cross-motion to dismiss in accordance with the following amended schedule: By August 18, 2020, Plaintiff shall file the motion for summary judgment, not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages; By September 8, 2020, Defendant shall file the opposition to Plaintiffs motionfor summary judgment and the cross-motion to dismiss, not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages; By September 29, 2020, Plaintiff shall file the opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss and the reply in support of the motion for summary judgment, not to exceed twenty (20) pages; and By October 6, 2020, Defendant shall file the reply in support of the motion to dismiss, not to exceed ten (10) pages. It is further ORDERED that, notwithstanding the aforementioned page allocation, the parties may reallocate the page numbers as they deem appropriate, so long as no party exceeds forty-five (45) pages of briefing in total. The parties shall comply with this Court's Individual Rules, including those with respect to exhibit limits and courtesy copies, in filing their motion papers. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close the motion at Dkt. No. 7.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/23/2020) (ks)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Preliminary Conference re Extended Schedule addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Helen Davis Chaitman dated June 22, 2020. Document filed by Marlene Krauss..(Chaitman, Helen)
June 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/3/2020. Responses due by 7/31/2020, Replies due by 8/7/2020. (jca)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference; terminating #4 Letter Motion for Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to withdraw the bankruptcy reference at Dkt. No. 1 is GRANTED for substantially the reasons identified in the motion. The above-captioned adversary proceeding is withdrawn from the Bankruptcy Court in its entirety and shall be immediately transferred to this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and Rule 5011(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. It is further ORDERED that the order at Dkt. No. 3 is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall brief Plaintiff's proposed motion for summary judgment in accordance with the following schedule: By July 3, 2020, Plaintiff shall file the motion for summary judgment; By July 31, 2020, Defendant shall file her opposition; and By August 7, 2020, Plaintiff shall file the reply. The parties shall comply with this Courts Individual Rules, including those with respect to page and exhibit limits, in filing their motion papers. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close the motions at Dkt. Nos. 1 and 4. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2020) (jca)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Helen Davis Chaitman dated June 4, 2020 re: Trustee's Letter dated June 4, 2020. Document filed by Marlene Krauss..(Chaitman, Helen)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Request for Pre-Motion Conference for Permission to File a Motion for Summary Judgment) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Nicholas J. Cremona dated June 4, 2020. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 6/5/2020, Doc. #6 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Reference (Dkt. No. 1) by June 23, 2020. (Responses due by 6/23/2020). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/2/2020) (rjm) Modified on 6/5/2020 (jca).
June 1, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
May 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
May 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4489A, 08-1789 (SMB).Document filed by Marlene Krauss. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irving H. Picard v.Marlene Krauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Krauss
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Represented By: Nicholas J. Cremona
Represented By: David J. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?