James Quinn et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: FAHMIA, INC., PRINZO & ASSOCIATES, LLC, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, JAMES QUINN d/b/a Q FINANCIAL SERVICES, Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn doing business as Q Financial Services and James Quinn
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., d/b/a CHASE BANK, DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,, DOES 1 through 100 and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. doing business as Chase Bank
Consolidated Defendant: Citibank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., MUFG Americas Holding Co., MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. doing business as Chase Bank and Signature Bank
Consolidated Plaintiff: Robin Johnson individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as CG Johnson Company
Not Classified By Court: MUFG Americas Holdings Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04100
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332df
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Anne Shaver in Opposition re: (28 in 1:20-cv-05311-JSR) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Tax Divas, LLC, Williams and J Bookkeeping, Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn, Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SBA Guide to SBA Programs, #2 Exhibit B - SBA PPP Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - SBA Steps in the Life of an SBA Loan, #4 Exhibit D - SBA 7(a) Loan Closing Checklist, #5 Exhibit E - SBA SOP 50 10, #6 Exhibit F - Seppala, How Long Does It Take to Get An SBA Loan Approved, #7 Exhibit G - Wang, SBA Loans What You Need to Know, #8 Exhibit H - Chase Website, #9 Exhibit I - Hsu and Bernard, Coronavirusa Layoff Surge)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR et al..(Shaver, Anne)
July 24, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (28 in 1:20-cv-05311-JSR) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. . Document filed by Tax Divas, LLC, Williams and J Bookkeeping, Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn, Robin Johnson. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR et al..(Shaver, Anne)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL W. SOBOL granting #49 Motion for Michael W. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice ascounsel for Plaintiff in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/24/2020) (mml)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ROGER N. HELLER granting #50 Motion for Roger N. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/24/2020) (mml)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW R. KAUFMAN granting #52 Motion for Andrew R. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/24/2020) (mml)
July 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #57 MOTION for Anne B. Shaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20815518. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 23, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Anne B. Shaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20815518. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (California), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (Colorado), #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Shaver, Anne)
July 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Oral Argument set for 8/7/2020 is adjourned to 8/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR et al.(Kotowski, Linda)
July 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/21/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Andrew R. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt # ANYSDC-20640843. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 10, 2020 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Sylvia E. Simson in Support re: #53 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim and Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - Note).(Simson, Sylvia)
July 10, 2020 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Andrew Soukup in Support re: #53 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim and Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SBA Form 159, #2 Exhibit B - SBA Form 2483, #3 Exhibit C - SBA Form 2484, #4 Exhibit D - CARES Action Section 1102, #5 Exhibit E - PPP Information Sheet - Lenders, #6 Exhibit F - Transcript of HCFS Hearing, #7 Exhibit G - PPP Loans - FAQs, #8 Exhibit H - 2015 SBA OIG Report, #9 Exhibit I - 2018 SBA OIG Report, #10 Exhibit J - AICPA Article on CPA Involvement, #11 Exhibit K - AICPA Article on PPP).(Simson, Sylvia)
July 10, 2020 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim and Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Simson, Sylvia)
July 10, 2020 Filing 53 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim and Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Simson, Sylvia)
July 10, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Andrew R. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt # ANYSDC-20640843. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (TN), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Kaufman, Andrew)
July 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #51 MOTION for Andrew R. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20640843. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Affidavit has an incorrect case number. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 10, 2020 Filing 51 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Andrew R. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20640843. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (TN), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Kaufman, Andrew) Modified on 7/10/2020 (aea).
July 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #50 MOTION for Roger N. Heller to Appear Pro Hac ViceReceipt # ANYSDC-20625582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 10, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Roger N. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt # ANYSDC-20625582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Heller, Roger)
July 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Michael W. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt # ANYSDC-20625840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 10, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Michael W. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt # ANYSDC-20625840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sobol, Michael)
July 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #47 MOTION for Roger N. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20625582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Affidavit attached to the motion has an incorrect case number. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #48 MOTION for Michael W. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20625840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Affidavit attached to the motion has an incorrect case number. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 9, 2020 Filing 48 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael W. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20625840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael W. Sobol, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sobol, Michael) Modified on 7/10/2020 (aea).
July 9, 2020 Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Roger N. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20625582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Roger N. Heller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Heller, Roger) Modified on 7/10/2020 (aea).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRATING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (19) Motion for Gary M. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04858-JSR. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/9/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR, 1:20-cv-04858-JSR (jwh)
July 8, 2020 Filing 45 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Robin Johnson, Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn..(Kaufman, Andrew)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The Court hereby grants plaintiffs' motion to refile amended complaints in the above-captioned matters no later than July 8, 2020 at 12:00 pm. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR, 1:20-cv-04858-JSR (jwh)
July 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/7/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 7, 2020 Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, against JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Robin Johnson, Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn. Related document: #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,..(Kaufman, Andrew) Modified on 7/8/2020 (pc). Modified on 7/9/2020 (jgo).
July 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew R Kaufman to RE-FILE Document No. #42 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The caption title can only include the caption title of the entitled case number (20cv4100). All parties involved must be listed et al, cannot be used. The amended complaint was incorrectly filed on the due date. Permission from Chambers will be needed to refile the Amended Complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, against JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn. Related document: #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,..(Kaufman, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2020 (pc).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF PAPER DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION: It is hereby stipulated by and between the Parties, through their respective counsel, as follows: The Parties agree to produce paper documents according to the following protocol: 1. All paper documents shall be produced as (1) TIFF images for black and white documents, and (2) JPG images for color documents. Such documents shall be accompanied by a cross-referenced load file, according to the specifications set forth in Section LC. hereto. The Parties do not waive any existing right to make responsive documents available for inspection pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34, and as further set forth in this stipulation. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR, 1:20-cv-04144-JSR, 1:20-cv-04145-JSR, 1:20-cv-04146-JSR, 1:20-cv-04858-JSR (jwh)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR, 1:20-cv-04144-JSR, 1:20-cv-04145-JSR, 1:20-cv-04146-JSR, 1:20-cv-04858-JSR (jwh)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The Johnson action is hereby consolidated with the actions bearing case numbers 20-cv-4100, 20-cv-4144, 20-cv-4145, and 20-cv-4146 for all pre-trial purposes and is subject to the June 23 Order and the schedules set forth therein. If plaintiffs' counsel has any issue with any of these, he must jointly call Chambers with opposing counsel by no later than June 26, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. (EST). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/25/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04100-JSR, 1:20-cv-04858-JSR (jwh)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM: As confirmed in the Order dated June 23, 2020, the Court has denied the request by defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase & Co. (collectively, "Chase") to stay their case until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") rules on a petition, dated May 22, 2020, to consolidate all "agent fee" cases arising out of the Paycheck Protection Program ("PPP"). The reasons for the denial were stated on the record during the telephonic conference in these cases on June 23, 2020. See Transcript dated June 23, 2020. But since it is sometimes said that stays in such circumstances are customary, it seems appropriate to elaborate in writing the reasons for the denial. (As further set forth herein this Memorandum.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/24/2020) (va)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Derek Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/23/2020) (jwh)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF PAUL J. FERAK PRO HAC VICE granting #33 Motion for Paul J. Ferak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/23/2020) (mml)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: For the reasons also stated by the Court during the telephonic conference, see Transcript dated June 23, 2020, the above-captioned four cases are consolidated for all pre-trial purposes. However, any party may, at a later stage, apply for reconsideration if such consolidation proves too unwieldy. The case is to be tried to a jury. The parties shall submit a joint protective order (to be modeled after the model protective order available at the Court's website) and ESI protocols on or before June 30, 2020 or, if they are unable to reach an agreement, shall call Chambers jointly pursuant to Rules 1 and 2 of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice by no later than June 30, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. to resolve any dispute(s). Briefs on any motions to dismiss must be filed and served on the following schedule: moving papers due July 10, 2020, answering papers due July 24, 2020, and reply papers due July 31, 2020. Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 7/6/2020. Motions due by 11/5/2020. Responses due by 11/18/2020 Replies due by 7/30/2020. Deposition due by 10/22/2020. Discovery due by 10/22/2020. Oral Argument set for 8/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/23/2020) (mml) Modified on 7/1/2020 (mml).
June 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2020. Present were counsel for all parties and a court reporter. Court's decision: these cases are consolidated for all pretrial purposes. Argument will be heard on August 7, 2020 at 11:00am on any motions filed. A final pretrial conference will be heard on December 7, 2020 at 4:00pm. (kgo)
June 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Derek Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20366754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Paul J. Ferak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20366993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 22, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Paul J. Ferak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20366993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Ferak Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order).(Ferak, Paul)
June 22, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Derek Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20366754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support of Motion).(Brandt, Derek)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/19/2020) (jwh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard D McCune, Jr on behalf of Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn..(McCune, Richard)
June 18, 2020 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Simson, Sylvia)
June 18, 2020 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co...(Simson, Sylvia)
June 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20315869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 18, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20315869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Errata C - Declaration in Support of Motion).(McCune, Richard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 34 JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f)(2).Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (jwh) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jwh).
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Lindenfeld on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Lindenfeld, Noah)
June 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Hammeran on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Hammeran, Keith)
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC..(Kusel, Elaine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fahmia, Inc...(Kusel, Elaine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JPMorgan Chase & Co. waiver sent on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Document filed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC; Fahmia, Inc.; James Quinn..(Kusel, Elaine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Document filed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC; Fahmia, Inc.; James Quinn..(Kusel, Elaine)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/23/2020 via teleconference, at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, with the following dial-in information: - USA Toll-Free: (888) 363-4735 - USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657 - Access Code: 1086415, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/9/2020) (jwh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sylvia E. Simson on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Simson, Sylvia)
June 8, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY re: #16 OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS, #17 OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS, . Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Kusel, Elaine)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS Statement by Interested Parties MUFG Americas Holdings Corp. and MUFG Union Bank, N.A., in Opposition to Plaintiff Fahmia, Inc.s Related Case Statement. Document filed by MUFG Americas Holdings Corp., MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Related Case Statement, No. 20-cv-4155, #2 Exhibit B - Order Declining Transfer, 20-cv-4036 (CD Cal.)).(Nicholson, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS Statement by Third-Parties Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiff Fahmia, Inc.'s Related Case Statement. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., CitiGroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Houpt, Christopher)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(jgo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase & Co...(jgo)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase & Co., re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn..(Kusel, Elaine)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn..(Kusel, Elaine)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against DOES 1 through 100, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC, Fahmia, Inc., James Quinn. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Kusel, Elaine)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - FILING ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Amended Complaint, against DOES 1 through 100, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Quinn. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint,..(Kusel, Elaine) Modified on 6/3/2020 (jgo).
June 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Elaine Simek Kusel to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; summonses have already been issued for these parties; the summons requests were not processed due to the deficient pleading; re-file your summons requests after you have properly re-filed your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of AMENDED Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
June 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Elaine Simek Kusel to RE-FILE re: Document No. #7 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; party name has been modified on pleading caption; 'JAMES QUINN' must be added to the case as a new party without an alias ; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase & Co., re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn..(Kusel, Elaine) Modified on 6/3/2020 (pne).
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC, James Quinn..(Kusel, Elaine) Modified on 6/3/2020 (pne).
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against DOES 1 through 100, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Quinn, Prinzo & Associates, LLC, Fahmia, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Kusel, Elaine) Modified on 6/3/2020 (pne).
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase & Co...(pne)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(pne)
May 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Elaine Simek Kusel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
May 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Elaine Simek Kusel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: James Quinn, Fahmia, Inc., Prinzo & Associates, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., DOES 1 through 100. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was entered incorrectly; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
May 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
May 29, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase & Co., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by FAHMIA, INC., JAMES QUINN d/b/a Q FINANCIAL SERVICES, PRINZO & ASSOCIATES, LLC, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated..(Kusel, Elaine)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by FAHMIA, INC., JAMES QUINN d/b/a Q FINANCIAL SERVICES, PRINZO & ASSOCIATES, LLC, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated..(Kusel, Elaine)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kusel, Elaine)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., d/b/a CHASE BANK, JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20023784)Document filed by JAMES QUINN d/b/a Q FINANCIAL SERVICES, PRINZO & ASSOCIATES, LLC, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, FAHMIA, INC...(Kusel, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Quinn et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAHMIA, INC.
Represented By: Elaine Simek Kusel
Represented By: Richard D McCune, Jr
Represented By: Andrew R Kaufman
Represented By: Derek Y. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINZO & ASSOCIATES, LLC, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Elaine Simek Kusel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES QUINN d/b/a Q FINANCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: Elaine Simek Kusel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prinzo & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Elaine Simek Kusel
Represented By: Richard D McCune, Jr
Represented By: Andrew R Kaufman
Represented By: Derek Y. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Quinn doing business as Q Financial Services
Represented By: Elaine Simek Kusel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Quinn
Represented By: Elaine Simek Kusel
Represented By: Richard D McCune, Jr
Represented By: Andrew R Kaufman
Represented By: Derek Y. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Paul J Ferak
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: Keith Hammeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., d/b/a CHASE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. doing business as Chase Bank
Represented By: Paul J Ferak
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: Keith Hammeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Christopher James Houpt
Represented By: Thomas V Panoff
Represented By: Andrew Spadafora
Represented By: Christopher Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: MUFG Americas Holding Co.
Represented By: Paul Fitzgerald Downs
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul Fitzgerald Downs
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Christopher James Houpt
Represented By: Thomas V Panoff
Represented By: Andrew Spadafora
Represented By: Christopher Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. doing business as Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Signature Bank
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Sacksteder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robin Johnson individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as CG Johnson Company
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Andrew R Kaufman
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Anne B. Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MUFG Americas Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?