Vallee et al v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne Vallee
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc., Zimmer Holdings Inc. and Zimmer US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04168
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/5/2020 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Smith, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
June 1, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
June 1, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sjo)
June 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
June 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 MDL CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Maine; Case Number: 2:20-cv-00180. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER. (jgd) [Transferred from Maine on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (aks) [Transferred from Maine on 6/1/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2233812.), filed by SUZANNE VALLEE.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN) [Transferred from Maine on 6/1/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 6/1/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER BIOMET INC, ZIMMER BIOMET US INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Zimmer Biomet US, Inc. summons, #2 Zimmer Biomet, Inc. summons)(bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 6/1/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 6/1/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER BIOMET INC, ZIMMER BIOMET US INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SUZANNE VALLEE. (Service of Process Deadline 8/17/2020) Fee due by 5/21/2020.(bfa) [Transferred from Maine on 6/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vallee et al v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Vallee
Represented By: Kevin M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?