Koby v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Plaintiff: John Koby
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04171
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducing all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 1/22/2021. All expert discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, shall be completed no later than March 8, 2021. Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by January 22, 2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate of the length of trial is 6 days. Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/14/2020) (rro)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of the above joint letter. (Dkt. #9). The Court will endorse the parties proposed case management plan under separate cover. Given the generous discovery deadlines, the Court will not grant discovery extensions absent good cause shown. The initial pretrial conference, previously scheduled for July 22, 2020, is hereby ADJOURNED. As stated in the case management plan, the next pretrial conference is scheduled for February 2, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. (Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/14/2020) (rro)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Alan Muraidekh and Steven Kantor dated July 14, 2020 re: Joint Letter. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/7/2020) (rro)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John Koby..(Kantor, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kantor, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(jgo)
June 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Steven Lawrence Kantor. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Koby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Kantor, Steven)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20057337)Document filed by John Koby..(Kantor, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koby v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Koby
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?