Done v. Peapod LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gilberto Done
Defendant: Joshua Muller and Peapod LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04194
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Capitolo, Christine)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Notice of Filing Of Petition for Removal. Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine)
June 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 4, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 4, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christine M. Capitolo to RE-FILE Document #8 Notice of Removal. Use the event type Notice (other) found under the event list Other Filings. (jgo)
June 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christine M. Capitolo to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E..Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-3017 Demand Confirmation, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Removal to State Court).(Capitolo, Christine)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E..Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jgo).
June 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christine M. Capitolo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the Petition for Removal must be filed as the initial pleading and the "Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal' must be filed as a separate filing under the Notice event type. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/8/2020. (jgo)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize N.V., Corporate Parent Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent Ahold Americas Holdings, Inc. for Peapod LLC. Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Chapman, Jerome)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Gilberto Done.(Kim, Albert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert K. Kim on behalf of Gilberto Done..(Kim, Albert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome C Chapman, IV on behalf of Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Chapman, Jerome)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jgo).
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine M. Capitolo on behalf of Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20070826).Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit A- Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-3017 Demand, #4 Exhibit C-Removal from State Court).(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/3/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Done v. Peapod LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Muller
Represented By: Christine M. Capitolo
Represented By: Jerome C Chapman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peapod LLC
Represented By: Christine M. Capitolo
Represented By: Jerome C Chapman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Done
Represented By: Albert K. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?