Michelsen et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Serenah Michelsen and Charles Michelsen
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04222
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/5/2020 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Smith, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 8, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
June 8, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
June 8, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Zimmer, Inc. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Charles Michelsen; Serenah Michelsen..(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(jgo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(jgo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc...(jgo)
June 4, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
June 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 4, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Michelsen, Serenah Michelsen..(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Michelsen, Serenah Michelsen..(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Michelsen, Serenah Michelsen..(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-2859. Document filed by Charles Michelsen, Serenah Michelsen..(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20085367)Document filed by Charles Michelsen, Serenah Michelsen..(Raso, Ashleigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelsen et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serenah Michelsen
Represented By: Ashleigh Raso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Michelsen
Represented By: Ashleigh Raso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?