EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch et al v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Case Number: 1:2020cv04258
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby extends all pretrial deadlines in this action as follows: Fact Discovery due by 2/22/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/27/20) (yv)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. So ordered, as modified in the scheduling order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/27/20) (yv)
July 24, 2020 Filing 53 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)..(La Salle, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 52 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. LaSalle dated July 24, 2020. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)..(La Salle, John)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #49 Motion for Richard W. Krebs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Richard W. Krebs, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/18/20) (yv)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #48 Motion for Khai LeQuang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Khai LeQuang, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/18/20) (yv)
June 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #48 MOTION for Khai LeQuang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20303478. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #49 MOTION for Richard W. Krebs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20303617. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The documents have been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 17, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Richard W. Krebs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20303617. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Krebs, Richard)
June 17, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Khai LeQuang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20303478. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(LeQuang, Khai)
June 8, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-04994-AKH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
June 8, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
June 4, 2020 Filing 47 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:19-cv-01696. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:18-cv-04994. (sjo)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (DKT. #45 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) in accordance with the Stipulation. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case transferred electronically. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Regarding Stipulation for Transfer of Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York)(LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Hammer counsel for Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. Jeffrey M. Hammer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant John Hancock Life Ins Co USA. (Hammer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shira Rebecca Anne Liu counsel for Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. Adding Shira Liu as counsel of record for John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Attorney Shira Rebecca Anne Liu added to party John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA(pty:dft))(Liu, Shira) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #41 filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA.(Vickery, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule (Dkt. #39 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is GRANTED, and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 27) is amended as follows: Last day to amend or add parties: 3/6/2020. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 3/26/2021. Initial Expert Disclosures: 12/11/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 1/25/2021. Reply Expert Disclosures: 2/25/2021. Last day to participate in a settlement conference or mediation: 2/25/2021. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement; 3/3/2021. Post Mediation Status Conference: 3/15/2021 at 11:30 AM. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 3/26/2021. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule (Modify) Case Schedule filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA.(Vickery, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re Stipulation for Protective Order #32 . (see document for details) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING THE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. #35 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt the Court finds good cause to GRANT the Stipulation. John Hancock shall respond to the First Amended Complaint no later than 11/11/2019. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA answer now due 11/11/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order REGARDING THE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Vickery, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 34 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING THE PROTOCOL GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, re Stipulation for Order #31 . (see document for details) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding the Protocol Governing the Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, re Status Report #29 served on 08/12/2019. (LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT (Joint) RE Selection of Private Neutral filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David A Gomez counsel for Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Adding David A. Gomez as counsel of record for Plaintiffs EFG BANK AG, CAYMAN BRANCH; and WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as securities intermediary for EFG BANK AG, CAYMAN BRANCH for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch; and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attorney David A Gomez added to party EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch(pty:pla), Attorney David A Gomez added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:pla))(Gomez, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (DKT. #22 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the parties' 07/19/2019 Joint Reports #24 and sets the following deadlines: Deadline to file joint report regarding agreed upon private neutral. If the parties are not able to agree, the joint report shall include three nominees from each party. A resume and hourly rate for each nominee shall be attached to the joint report. The Court will select a private neutral from the nominees proposed by the parties: 8/12/2019. Last day to amend or add parties: 10/15/2019. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 9/14/2020. Initial Expert Disclosures: 9/28/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 10/26/2020. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation: 10/26/2020. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement: 10/307/2020. Post Mediation Status Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 11:30 AM. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 12/14/2020. Last day to file All Motions (including discovery motions): 1/11/2021. The Court grants the parties' request to participate in a settlement conference with a private neutral. The parties are ordered to file a notice of settlement, with a proposed date by which the matter will be dismissed. No appearance will be required on 11/16/2020. (SEE CIVIL MINUTE FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 26, 2020. Status Conference set for November 16, 2020 at 11:30 am before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Vickery, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10, filed by Plaintiff EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch.. (LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Motty Shulman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A), designating Jeffrey M. Hamer as local counsel. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Hearing by Judge John A. Kronstadt: No Hearing/Under Submission. Joint Report Due: July 19, 2019. This case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order applies to all parties in this action, whether or not they are represented by counsel. "Counsel, as used in this Order also refers to parties who are representing themselves. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on each defendant, plaintiff shall promptly do so and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Defendant(s) also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. See order for further details.(shb) Modified on 5/17/2019 (shb). [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA.(Vickery, Alan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Motty Shulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/25/2019, Receipt No. 26H18R9C) filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #3 Proposed Order) (Hammer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Denying #15 Non-Resident Attorney Motty Shulman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Motty Shulman. If an amended application is not filed by 5/3/19, the clerk shall refund the fee back to counsel. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Terming Attorney Motty Shulman. (twdb) Modified on 4/26/2019 (twdb). [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Alan B.Vickery APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA) Defendant, designating Jeffrey M. Hammer as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney John F. LaSalle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA) Defendant, designating Jeffrey M. Hammer as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Motty Shulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/25/2019, Receipt No. 26H18R9C) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): FL missing. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Motty Shulman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/25/2019, Receipt No. 26H18R9C) filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Hammer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alan B. Vickery to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23616636) filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hammer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John F. LaSalle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23616514) filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hammer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA answer now due 5/15/2019, filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA.(Hammer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA, (Attorney Jeffrey M Hammer added to party John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA(pty:dft))(Hammer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on March 25, 2019, the Court amended its Consolidated Standing Order. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-kronstadt) to obtain a copy of the Order. The March 25, 2019 version of the Consolidated Standing Order is effective in this action immediately. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, upon Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Person Authorized to Accept Service on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance (U.S.A.) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association as securities intermediary for EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, identifying EFG International, Parent organization; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Securities intermediary for life insurance policies at issue. (LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by plaintiff EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association as securities intermediary for EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch. (LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association as securities intermediary for EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch. (LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23337888 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association as securities intermediary for EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint) (Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association as securities intermediary for EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch(pty:pla))(LeQuang, Khai) [Transferred from California Central on 6/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch et al v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: David A Gomez
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Richard W. Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFG Bank AG, Cayman Branch
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: David A Gomez
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Richard W. Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: John F LaSalle
Represented By: Alan B Vickery
Represented By: Shira Rebecca Anne Liu
Represented By: Jeffrey Hammer
Represented By: Alan Borden Vickery
Represented By: John Francis La Salle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?