State of New York v. United States Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK and The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York
Defendant: United States Department of Education and Elisabeth DeVos
Amicus Curiae: Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, AASA, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., American Association of University Professors, Council of Independent Colleges, National Council of Jewish Women, National Association of Secondary School Principals, National Association of College and University Business Officers, state of mississippi, State of Arkansas, State of Alaska, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, State of Indiana, Association of American Medical Colleges, State of Kentucky, University Risk Management and Insurance Association, State of South Carolina, State of Florida, WASC Senior College and University Commission, American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity American Humanist Association, Council of the Great City Schools, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, American Humanist Association, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, Association of American Universities, New England Commission of Higher Education, Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges, Council for Advancement and Support of Education, The Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education;, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, American Association of Community Colleges, American Council on Education, State of South Dakota, Diversity American Humanist Association, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, State of Texas, state of tennessee, state of oklahoma, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, The Superintendents' Association, State of Louisiana, American Dental Education Association, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, Education Law Center-PA, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, State of Georgia, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, state of nebraska, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, State of Alabama and Middle States Commission on Higher Education
Intervenor Defendant: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv04260
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #13 Amended Complaint. The time to respond to the complaint is extended to 15 days after the Court's decision on the motion for a preliminary injunction. SO ORDERED. Elisabeth DeVos answer due 8/19/2020; United States Department of Education answer due 8/19/2020 (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/30/2020) (jca)
July 29, 2020 Filing 78 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph Wardenski dated July 29, 2020 re: Correction. Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York..(Wardenski, Joseph)
July 29, 2020 Filing 77 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #13 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Benjamin T. Takemoto dated July 29, 2020. Document filed by Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education..(Takemoto, Benjamin)
July 28, 2020 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #76 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
July 28, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #76 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
July 27, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #47 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20866861. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Cooper, Charles)
July 27, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Dickey on behalf of Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education..(Dickey, Jennifer)
July 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Oral Argument date changed from 7/24/2020 to 7/31/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Phone number 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049 (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Oral Argument set for 7/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. The parties are to dial 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 74 BRIEF re: #66 Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief, #59 CONSENT MOTION to File Amicus Brief of Families Advocating For Campus Equality. Amicus Brief of Families Advocating For Campus Equality. Document filed by Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Appendix).(Miltenberg, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #35 Motion for Allen F. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/21/2020) (ks)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #34 Motion for John W. Borkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/21/2020) (ks)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #36 Motion for Aleksandra O. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/21/2020) (ks)
July 21, 2020 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Amicus Curiae Brief. Document filed by Stop Abusive and Violent Environments..(Kaplan, Susan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 69 BRIEF Amici States Brief in Support of Defendants. Document filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, state of mississippi, state of nebraska, state of oklahoma, state of tennessee..(Biggs, Adam)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. The application to file an amicus brief at docket number 67 is granted. The parties should arrange for the delivery of this amicus brief by FedEx to the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/20/20) (yv)
July 20, 2020 Filing 67 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Adam Arthur Biggs dated July 20, 2020. Document filed by State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, state of mississippi, state of nebraska, state of oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, state of tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amici Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Biggs, Adam)
July 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #59 Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #61 Motion to File Amicus Brief. The applications to file amicus briefs at docket numbers 59 and 61 are granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/18/2020) (ks)
July 17, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York..(Wardenski, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 64 BRIEF re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Amicus Brief of the Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2).(Cooper, Charles)
July 17, 2020 Filing 63 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Attorney Lindsay Pickell terminated.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/2020) (jwh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Karen Courtheoux dated July 17, 2020 re: Certificates of Good Standing of John Borkowski, Allen James and Aleksandra Rushing. Document filed by AASA, Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Superintendents' Association. (Attachments: #1 1 - Certificates of Good Standing for John W. Borkowski, #2 2 - Certificate of Good Standing for Allen F. James, #3 3 - Certificates of Good Standing for Aleksandra O. Rushing).(Courtheoux, Karen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 61 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Susan Kaplan, Jesse Binnall dated 07/17/2020. Document filed by Stop Abusive and Violent Environments. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief).(Kaplan, Susan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Robin Kaplan on behalf of Stop Abusive and Violent Environments..(Kaplan, Susan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 59 CONSENT MOTION to File Amicus Brief of Families Advocating For Campus Equality. Document filed by Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Appendix, #3 Proposed Order).(Miltenberg, Andrew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, American Humanist Association, Education Law Center-PA, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Council of Jewish Women..(Kehlmann, Geoffrey)
July 15, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Lindsay Pickell to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit).(Pickell, Lindsay)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Cynthia E. Tobisman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Cynthia E. Tobisman for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/14/20) (yv)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #49 Motion for Nicole J. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/14/2020) (kv)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #29 Motion for Geoffrey B. Kehlmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/14/2020) (kv)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #50 Motion for Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/14/2020) (kv)
July 13, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6).(Takemoto, Benjamin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Thomas Takemoto on behalf of Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education..(Takemoto, Benjamin)
July 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Nicole J. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20662600. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #50 MOTION for Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 13, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian W. Barnes, #2 Exhibit Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Barnes, Brian)
July 13, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Nicole J. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20662600. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Nicole J. Moss, #2 Exhibit North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Moss, Nicole)
July 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #48 MOTION for Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20662297. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from DC;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
July 13, 2020 Filing 48 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20662297. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian W. Barnes, #2 Exhibit Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Barnes, Brian) Modified on 7/13/2020 (vba).
July 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 7/17/2020. (mro)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #24 MOTION to Intervene filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. FIRE's motion to intervene is denied. To the extent FIRE seeks to file an amicus brief, FIRE may do so by July 17, 2020. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 24. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/10/2020) (mro)
July 10, 2020 Filing 46 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by AASA, Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Superintendents' Association..(Courtheoux, Karen)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #41 Motion for David Hinojosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/10/2020) (ama)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/8/2020) (js)
July 7, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lindsay Pickell dated 07/07/2020. Document filed by Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education..(Pickell, Lindsay)
July 7, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order in Commonwelath of Pa. v. DeVos).(Cooper, Charles)
July 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 AMENDED MOTION for David Hinojosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 6, 2020 Filing 41 AMENDED MOTION for David Hinojosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, American Humanist Association, Education Law Center-PA, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Council of Jewish Women. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Corrected Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hinojosa, David)
July 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for John William Borkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #29 MOTION for Geoffrey B. Kehlmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20531397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #36 MOTION for Aleksandra O. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #38 CONSENT MOTION for Cynthia E. Tobisman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #35 MOTION for Allen Ford James to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Aleksandra O. Rushing, Allen Ford James, and John William Borkowski must submit Certificates of Good Standing upon receipt. (aea)
July 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #30 MOTION for David Hinojosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20531722. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS. Please contact the Supreme Court of Texas at PO Box 12248 Austin, TX 78711, 512-463-1312. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #33 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #37 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. The applications to file amicus briefs at docket numbers 33 and 37 are granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/3/2020) (rro)
July 3, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #24 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education..(Cooper, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 38 CONSENT MOTION for Cynthia E. Tobisman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity American Humanist Association, American Humanist Association, Education Law Center-PA, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Council of Jewish Women. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cynthia E. Tobisman, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Tobisman, Cynthia)
July 2, 2020 Filing 37 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Karen Courtheoux dated 07/02/2020. Document filed by AASA, Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Superintendents' Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Curiae brief).(Courtheoux, Karen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Aleksandra O. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AASA, Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Superintendents' Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Aleksandra O. Rushing, #2 Proposed Order).(Courtheoux, Karen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Allen Ford James to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AASA, Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Superintendents' Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allen F. James, #2 Proposed Order).(Courtheoux, Karen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for John William Borkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AASA, Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals, The Superintendents' Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of John Borkowski, #3 Proposed Order).(Courtheoux, Karen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 33 CONSENT MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity American Humanist Association, American Humanist Association, Education Law Center-PA, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Council of Jewish Women. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Brief of the Civil Rights and Advocacy Amici as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Civil Rights and Advocacy Amici Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction).(Kehlmann, Geoffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Lisabeth Courtheoux on behalf of AASA, The Superintendents' Association, Council of the Great City Schools, National Association of Secondary School Principals..(Courtheoux, Karen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #24 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York..(Wardenski, Joseph)
July 2, 2020 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David Hinojosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20531722. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity American Humanist Association, Education Law Center-PA, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Council of Jewish Women, American Humanist Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Hinojosa, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hinojosa, David) Modified on 7/6/2020 (aea).
July 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Geoffrey B. Kehlmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20531397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity American Humanist Association, Education Law Center-PA, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, National Council of Jewish Women, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey B. Kehlmann, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac ViceOrder for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kehlmann, Geoffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF OF THE AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION AND 24 OTHER HIGHER EDUCATION ORGANIZATIONS AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Document filed by American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities, Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Council of Independent Colleges, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, New England Commission of Higher Education, The Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education;, University Risk Management and Insurance Association, WASC Senior College and University Commission..(Fleming, Benjamin)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 Motion for Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/2/2020) (ks)
June 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Status Conference held on 6/30/2020. (kgo)
June 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/13/2020 Replies due by 7/17/2020. (ks)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion to File Amicus Brief. As discussed at the conference held on June 30, 2020: The motion to file an amicus brief in support of the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is granted. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 22. The plaintiffs shall respond to the motion to intervene by July 2, 2020. The proposed intervenor may reply by July 3, 2020. The defendants shall respond to the motion for preliminary injunction by July 13, 2020. The plaintiffs may reply by July 17, 2020. If the motion to intervene is granted, the intervenor shall also respond to the motion for preliminary injunction by July 13, 2020. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/30/2020) (ks)
June 29, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education..(Cooper, Charles)
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer of Proposed Intervenor FIRE).(Cooper, Charles)
June 29, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20465465. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 29, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20465465. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles J. Cooper, #2 Exhibit Alabama Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Georgia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Cooper, Charles)
June 26, 2020 Telephone Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. To access the conference, dial 888-363-4749 and enter access code 8140049. (Lee, Amanda; Fletcher, Donnie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Benjamin A. Fleming dated June 26, 2020. Document filed by American Council on Education, The Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education;, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of University Professors, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities, Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Council of Independent Colleges, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, New England Commission of Higher Education, University Risk Management and Insurance Association, WASC Senior College and University Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction).(Fleming, Benjamin)
June 26, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Pickell on behalf of Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education..(Pickell, Lindsay)
June 25, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Joseph Wardenski in Support re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of ACE President Ted Mitchell on Final Title IX Regulations (May 6, 2020), #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from J. Shapiro et al. to E. DeVos et al. (Mar. 27, 2020, #3 Exhibit 3 - DeVos releases Title IX campus sexual assault rule, LA School Report (May 6, 2020), #4 Exhibit 4 - US Dep't of Educ., Revised Sexual Harassment Guidance (Jan. 2001), #5 Exhibit 5 - US Dep't of Educ., Dear Colleague Letter: Sexual Harassment Issues (Jan. 25, 2006), #6 Exhibit 6 - US Dep't of Educ., Dear Colleague Letter: Harassment and Bullying (Oct. 26, 2010), #7 Exhibit 7 - US Dep't of Educ., Dear Colleague Letter: Sexual Violence (Apr. 4, 2011), #8 Exhibit 8 - US Dep't of Educ., Q&A on Title IX and Sexual Violence (Apr. 29, 2014), #9 Exhibit 9 - US Dep't of Educ., Dear Colleague Letter: Campus Sexual Misconduct (Sept. 22, 2017), #10 Exhibit 10 - US Dep't of Educ., Dear Colleague Letter: Prohibited Disability Harassment (July 25, 2006), #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Laura Brantley, #12 Exhibit 12 - Redline Showing Final Rule's Amendments to Title IX Regulations, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Joseph Storch, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Rodney L. Pepe-Souvenir, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Andrea Stagg, #16 Exhibit 16 - AASA, Report of Initial Findings: COVID Survey 2 Impact on Public Schools (June 12, 2020), #17 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Victoria A. Ajibade, #18 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Mary Haviland).(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 25, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/22/2020) (ks)
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay McKenzie on behalf of State of New York..(McKenzie, Lindsay)
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph Wardenski dated June 19, 2020. Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabita Lakshmi Krishnan on behalf of The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York..(Krishnan, Sabita)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education.Document filed by State of New York, The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Elisabeth DeVos served on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020; United States Department of Education served on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/8/2020) (rro)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File letter motion to permit service of the complaint and summonses by email addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph Wardenski dated June 5, 2020. Document filed by State of New York..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morenike Fajana on behalf of State of New York..(Fajana, Morenike)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Education..(jgo)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elisabeth DeVos..(jgo)
June 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Wardenski. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: STATE OF NEW YORK; Elisabeth DeVos. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Colangelo on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK..(Colangelo, Matthew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elisabeth DeVos, in her official capacity as the Secretary of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by STATE OF NEW YORK..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by STATE OF NEW YORK..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Wardenski on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wardenski, Joseph)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elisabeth DeVos, United States Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20108508)Document filed by STATE OF NEW YORK..(Wardenski, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. United States Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Lindsay Pickell
Represented By: Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth DeVos
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Lindsay Pickell
Represented By: Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Morenike Fajana
Represented By: Lindsay McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Education for the City School District of the City of New York
Represented By: Sabita Lakshmi Krishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Public and Land-grant Universities
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AASA
Represented By: Karen Lisabeth Courtheoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of University Professors
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council of Independent Colleges
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council of Jewish Women
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Secondary School Principals
Represented By: Karen Lisabeth Courtheoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of College and University Business Officers
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: state of mississippi
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alaska
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: College and University Professional Association for Human Resources
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Indiana
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kentucky
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University Risk Management and Insurance Association
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Florida
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASC Senior College and University Commission
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity American Humanist Association
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council of the Great City Schools
Represented By: Karen Lisabeth Courtheoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Humanist Association
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Universities
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New England Commission of Higher Education
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council for Advancement and Support of Education
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education;
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of Community Colleges
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Council on Education
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Diversity American Humanist Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Texas
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: state of tennessee
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: state of oklahoma
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Superintendents' Association
Represented By: Karen Lisabeth Courtheoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Dental Education Association
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stop Abusive and Violent Environments
Represented By: Susan Robin Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Education Law Center-PA
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey Barrett Kehlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Indian Higher Education Consortium
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Georgia
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of State Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: state of nebraska
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alabama
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Middle States Commission on Higher Education
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Represented By: Nicole J Moss
Represented By: Charles J Cooper
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?