Fasharnice Stone v. White Plains Road Realty LLC
Plaintiff: FASHARNICE STONE
Defendant: WHITE PLAINS ROAD REALTY LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04272
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Telephone Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Thursday, September 03, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel is directed to call the courts telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. The Defendant is directed to serve this order, and a copy of the Notice of Removal on the Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/2/2020) (kv)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/2/2020) (jwh)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Jurisdiction is invoked pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. The complaint (or notice of removal) fails adequately to allege the existence of subject matter jurisdiction because, perhaps among other things, it fails adequately to allege: The citizenship of one or more limited liability companies. See Handlesman v. Bedford Village Green Assocs. L.P., 213 F.3d 48, 52 (2d Cir. 2000). Absent the filing, on or before June 17, 2020 of an amended complaint (or notice of removal) adequately alleging the existence of subject matter jurisdiction, the action will be dismissed (or remanded). SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/9/2020) (jca)
June 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Marjorie Jules to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the signed PDF. (pne)
June 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marjorie Jules. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fasharnice Stone, White Plains Road Realty LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
June 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 8, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Notice of Removal,. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20150901..(Jules, Marjorie)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jules, Marjorie) Modified on 6/9/2020 (pne).
June 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Marjorie Jules. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Marjorie Jules. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 6/10/2020..(pne)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME, County of BRONX. Case Number: 20745/2020E..Document filed by WHITE PLAINS ROAD REALTY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendants Answer and Demands, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs Bil of Particulars, #4 Exhibit Client Affidavit).(Jules, Marjorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fasharnice Stone v. White Plains Road Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FASHARNICE STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE PLAINS ROAD REALTY LLC
Represented By: Marjorie Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?