Philpot v. Counter Productions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Michael L. Jones, John or Jane Doe 1, John or Jane Doe 4, Counter Productions, Inc., John or Jane Doe 5, John or Jane Doe 2 and John or Jane Doe 3
Case Number: 1:2020cv04307
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Counter Productions, Inc...(pne)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael L. Jones..(pne)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael L. Jones, re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Counter Productions, Inc., re: #14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, against Counter Productions, Inc., John or Jane Does 1 throug 5, Michael L. Jones with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Larry G. Philpot. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 26, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John or Jane Does 1 throug 5 added. Party added pursuant to #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Larry G. Philpot. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kenton James Hutcherson to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons requests were not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kenton James Hutcherson to RE-FILE re: Document No. #10 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party John or Jane Does 1 through 5; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Kenton J. Hutcherson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Michael L. Jones, re: #10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Counter Productions, Inc., re: #10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Counter Productions, Inc., John or Jand Does 1 through 5, Michael L. Jones with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Larry G. Philpot. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Hutcherson, Kenton) Modified on 6/22/2020 (jgo).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/15/2020) (ama)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kenton James Hutcherson to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption (John or Jane Does 1 through 5). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenton James Hutcherson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael L. Jones; John or Jane Doe 1. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was removed and entered as party text. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenton James Hutcherson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jgo).
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Kenton James Hutcherson. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: John or Jane Doe 2; John or Jane Doe 3; John or Jane Doe 4; John or Jane Doe 5. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo)
June 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Kenton J. Hutcherson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20130875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael L. Jones, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jgo).
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Counter Productions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jgo).
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Kenton J. Hutcherson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20130875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kenton J. Hutcherson, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Counter Productions, Inc., John or Jane Doe 1, John or Jane Doe 2, John or Jane Doe 3, John or Jane Doe 4, John or Jane Doe 5, Michael L. Jones. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20130392)Document filed by Larry G. Philpot..(Hutcherson, Kenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Counter Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Kenton James Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counter Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?