Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. Fidelis Contracting, Inc.
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund and Anna Gutsin
Respondent: Fidelis Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04318
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/30/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, Summons, Rule 7.1 Statement served on Fidelis Contracting, Inc. on 7/8/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent, NYS Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fidelis Contracting, Inc...(dnh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fidelis Contracting, Inc., re: #5 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
July 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/2/2020. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to call chambers by July 16, 2020 with an update on process of service. (Kotowski, Linda)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, via teleconference, with the following dial-in information: - USA Toll-Free: (888) 363-4735 - USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657 - Access Code: 1086415, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/11/2020) (jwh)
June 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Haluk Savci to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request is linked to a pleading that was not accepted by the Court; re-file the summons request and link it to the properly filed pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
June 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Haluk Savci to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the signed PDF. (pne)
June 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION..Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Haluk Savci to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The text on the first page of the PDF (Petition to Confirm) does not clearly indicate the type of pleading being filed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the corrected PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/15/2020. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fidelis Contracting, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Savci, Haluk) Modified on 6/10/2020 (pne).
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20133243).Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk) Modified on 6/8/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. Fidelis Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anna Gutsin
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fidelis Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?