King et al v. Habib Bank Limited
Plaintiff: Kevin King, Luke Spehar, Kade M. Osborn, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Paul Edward Goins, III, Jane Sparks, Paul Elmer Jayne, Kent Alan Skeens, Douglas Nichols, Frederick C. Benson, Summer Breanne Sutton, Cynthia Nichols, Vanessa Marie Anzures, Jean S. Landphair, Tennyson Charles Harris, K.K., Meredith Landphair, Tammy Renee Mays, Ashley Michelle Harris, Michelle Hock, David Aaron Crow, Maria Soltero, Janice H. Proctor, Jacob Louis Spehar, Felicia Gross Paniagua, Jose Aleman, Alexander Lee Mittler, Leeann Schmidt, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Lisa Martinusen, Justina Hardison, Martin P. Madden, S.L.L.B., Karyn Stone Marta, Garry Lee Sparks, Joyce L. Turner, Ryan Gregory Timoney, Shawn Patrick Griffin, Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr., Tammy Olmstead, Samantha G. Roldan, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Ronald Paul Hopkins, Brandon Tyler Schmidt, Marie Sentina Mielke, Michelle Carolina Rotelli, Thomas Elmer Wickliff, Gloria Diane Trelfa, H.R., Robert Charles Darrough, Alyson Overman Rodgers, Dana Rainey, Luann Varney, Jannett Cecilia Roberts, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, Sherry A. Skeens, Linda Reynolds, Jordan Gilbert, Martha Carolina Smith, Talisa Shervon Williams, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Kelli Dodge, Julie Ann Ellis, Adrian Carrillo Soltero, Daniel Matias Cabrera, Michael Collins, Creighton David Osborn, Jonathan Cleary, Ann L. Gould, Donald Edward Newman, Sr., Brian Gregory Clyburn, Dan Olmstead, Diane Timoney, Sorainya Harris, Michelle Rose McEvoy, Pamela J. Madden, Christine Rangel, Susan Novak, Arthur Campbell, Dennis John Elm, Jamie Johanna Coates, Thomas Smedinghoff, Nicole Kamaleson, Erin Nicole Goss, Corbin Cabrera, Gabriel Negron, Annette Spehar, Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr., Terry Mittler, Patricia Goins, James A. Gould, Daniel Griffin, Christopher Powers, Jerry Hardison, Katherine Abreu-Border, Tina Marie Campbell, G.S., Georganne M. Siercks, Barclay Kamaleson, S.L.B., Baily Zimmerman, Phillip J. Schmidt, Zackary Welch, Blaine A. Redding, R.X.C., Shannon K. McNulty, Tracy Bennedsen, Donna Lee Elm, Z.R.S., Brandon Nichols, Jasmine Thomas, Brian Lambka, Brianna N. Benson, Adam Matthew Jayne, Sheila Ristaino, Abby Knapp-Morris, Maribel Negron, Chris Lee Zimmerman, Patrick Spehar, Heather L. Reed, Katlyn M. Osborn, Samantha Shervon Williams, Cassie Marie Richardson, M.G.C., Misty Marie Barclay, Sonja McDaniel, Teresa Hardison, Socorro Gross Paniagua, Harriet Sutton, Justin T. Plunk, Matthias P. Roldan, Marvin Negron, Charmaine Renee Gilbert, Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks, Martin E. Madden, Kimberley A. Whipple, Brian Edward Ellis, Catherine Elm Boatwright, Mitchell L. Stambaugh, Felicia Ann Harris, Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne, Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua, Karma Chisholm, Trecia Brock Hood, Wendy Shedd, JD Prosser, Michelle Zimmerman, Robert Cabrera, Kristie Surprenant, Amanda Newman, Louella E. Frison, Tiffany Dotson, Matthew Elm, Leslie Rodriguez, Stephanie Rufus, Michael Rufus, II, Jessica Novak Cruz, Christopher Wayne Johnson, Bob Surprenant, Thomas Pierce Mays, R.G., Gregory Timoney, Janice Harriman Bryant, E.N.R., Clarence Williams, Jr., Patrick Charles McEvoy, Mary Beth Smedinghoff, Audrey Campbell, Lawrence Marta, Lindsey R. Maldonado, April Cleary, David Whipple, Cade Kamaleson, Cody Cheyenne Mays, Jordan Lambka, Angel R. Roldan, Natasha Buchanan, Randy Ristau, Stephanie Hager, Carol Griffin, Glenda Willard, Gillian Leigh Cabrera, Douglas A. Landphair, Cristine Mittler, William Michael Burley, L.A.E.L.B., Judith Sara Darrough, August Cabrera, Kathleen McEvoy, B.C.D., G.A.S., Barry Welch, Beverly Mills, Shannon Denise Collins, Lorria Welch, Glenn Chisholm, Jordan Plunk, M.M., Zachary Douglas Sparks, Martha Looney, Margaret Elm Campbell, Freddie Dewey Sutton, Lieselotte R. Roldan, Jose Negron, Brandon Korona, C. Richard Looney, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Sean Whipple, Marta Torres, David L. Parker, Colleen Whipple, Julianna Symkowiak, Thomas Priolo, Joel C. Cruz, Carlos Cruz, Angela Kahler, Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts, P.A.D., T.L.S., David Reed, Alex Henigan, Matt Griffin, Evelyn Taylor, Janice Caruso, Suzanne Renae Martinez, Derrick Anthony Davis, Christa L. Osborn, Suzanne Ristau, Ranee Massoni, Stephanie Ann Miller, Victor Raymond Ellis, Taylor Marta, Scott Bennedsen, Erik Sparks and Garrett Layne Funk
Defendant: Habib Bank Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv04322
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ryan Robert Sparacino to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at August 13, 2020 at 10:50 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/24/2020) (cf) Modified on 6/25/2020 (cf).
June 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Ryan Robert Sparacino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Ryan Robert Sparacino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20261107. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Ryan Robert Sparacino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Katherine Abreu-Border, Jose Aleman, Vanessa Marie Anzures, B.C.D., Misty Marie Barclay, Scott Bennedsen, Tracy Bennedsen, Brianna N. Benson, Frederick C. Benson, Catherine Elm Boatwright, Janice Harriman Bryant, Natasha Buchanan, William Michael Burley, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, August Cabrera, Corbin Cabrera, Daniel Matias Cabrera, Gillian Leigh Cabrera, Robert Cabrera, Arthur Campbell, Audrey Campbell, Margaret Elm Campbell, Tina Marie Campbell, Janice Caruso, Glenn Chisholm, Karma Chisholm, April Cleary, Jonathan Cleary, Brian Gregory Clyburn, Jamie Johanna Coates, Michael Collins, Shannon Denise Collins, David Aaron Crow, Carlos Cruz, Jessica Novak Cruz, Joel C. Cruz, Judith Sara Darrough, Robert Charles Darrough, Derrick Anthony Davis, Kelli Dodge, Tiffany Dotson, E.N.R., Brian Edward Ellis, Julie Ann Ellis, Victor Raymond Ellis, Dennis John Elm, Donna Lee Elm, Matthew Elm, Louella E. Frison, Garrett Layne Funk, G.A.S., G.S.(y and through his next friend Georganne M. Siercks), Charmaine Renee Gilbert, Jordan Gilbert, Patricia Goins, Paul Edward Goins, III, Erin Nicole Goss, Ann L. Gould, James A. Gould, Carol Griffin, Daniel Griffin, Matt Griffin, Shawn Patrick Griffin, H.R., Stephanie Hager, Jerry Hardison, Justina Hardison, Teresa Hardison, Ashley Michelle Harris, Felicia Ann Harris, Sorainya Harris, Tennyson Charles Harris, Alex Henigan, Michelle Hock, Trecia Brock Hood, Ronald Paul Hopkins, Adam Matthew Jayne, Paul Elmer Jayne, Christopher Wayne Johnson, K.K., Angela Kahler, Barclay Kamaleson, Cade Kamaleson, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Nicole Kamaleson, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Kevin King, Abby Knapp-Morris, Brandon Korona, L.A.E.L.B., Brian Lambka, Jordan Lambka, Douglas A. Landphair, Jean S. Landphair, Meredith Landphair, C. Richard Looney, Martha Looney, M.G.C., M.M., Martin E. Madden, Martin P. Madden, Pamela J. Madden, Lindsey R. Maldonado, Karyn Stone Marta, Lawrence Marta, Taylor Marta, Suzanne Renae Martinez, Lisa Martinusen, Ranee Massoni, Cody Cheyenne Mays, Tammy Renee Mays, Thomas Pierce Mays, Sonja McDaniel, Kathleen McEvoy, Michelle Rose McEvoy, Patrick Charles McEvoy, Shannon K. McNulty, Marie Sentina Mielke, Stephanie Ann Miller, Beverly Mills, Alexander Lee Mittler, Cristine Mittler, Terry Mittler, Gabriel Negron, Jose Negron, Maribel Negron, Marvin Negron, Amanda Newman, Donald Edward Newman, Sr, Brandon Nichols, Cynthia Nichols, Douglas Nichols, Susan Novak, Dan Olmstead, Tammy Olmstead, Christa L. Osborn, Creighton David Osborn, Kade M. Osborn, Katlyn M. Osborn, P.A.D., Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua, Felicia Gross Paniagua, Socorro Gross Paniagua, David L. Parker, Jordan Plunk, Justin T. Plunk, Christopher Powers, Thomas Priolo, Janice H. Proctor, JD Prosser, R.G., R.X.C., Dana Rainey, Christine Rangel, Blaine A. Redding, David Reed, Heather L. Reed, Linda Reynolds, Cassie Marie Richardson, Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr, Sheila Ristaino, Randy Ristau, Suzanne Ristau, Jannett Cecilia Roberts, Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts, Alyson Overman Rodgers, Leslie Rodriguez, Angel R. Roldan, Lieselotte R. Roldan, Matthias P. Roldan, Samantha G. Roldan, Michelle Carolina Rotelli, Michael Rufus, II, Stephanie Rufus, S.L.B., S.L.L.B., Brandon Tyler Schmidt, Leeann Schmidt, Phillip J. Schmidt, Wendy Shedd, Georganne M. Siercks, Kent Alan Skeens, Sherry A. Skeens, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Mary Beth Smedinghoff, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Thomas Smedinghoff, Martha Carolina Smith, Adrian Carrillo Soltero, Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr, Maria Soltero, Erik Sparks, Garry Lee Sparks, Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks, Jane Sparks, Zachary Douglas Sparks, Annette Spehar, Jacob Louis Spehar, Luke Spehar, Patrick Spehar, Mitchell L. Stambaugh, Bob Surprenant, Kristie Surprenant, Freddie Dewey Sutton, Harriet Sutton, Summer Breanne Sutton, Julianna Symkowiak, T.L.S., Evelyn Taylor, Jasmine Thomas, Diane Timoney, Gregory Timoney, Ryan Gregory Timoney, Marta Torres, Gloria Diane Trelfa, Joyce L. Turner, Luann Varney, Barry Welch, Lorria Welch, Zackary Welch, Colleen Whipple, David Whipple, Kimberley A. Whipple, Sean Whipple, Thomas Elmer Wickliff, Glenda Willard, Clarence Williams, Jr, Samantha Shervon Williams, Talisa Shervon Williams, Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne, Z.R.S., Baily Zimmerman, Chris Lee Zimmerman, Michelle Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing).(Sparacino, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 MOTION for Ryan Robert Sparacino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20261107. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from District of Columbia. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Ryan Robert Sparacino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20261107. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Katherine Abreu-Border, Jose Aleman, Vanessa Marie Anzures, B.C.D., Misty Marie Barclay, Scott Bennedsen, Tracy Bennedsen, Brianna N. Benson, Frederick C. Benson, Catherine Elm Boatwright, Janice Harriman Bryant, Natasha Buchanan, William Michael Burley, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, August Cabrera, Corbin Cabrera, Daniel Matias Cabrera, Gillian Leigh Cabrera, Robert Cabrera, Arthur Campbell, Audrey Campbell, Margaret Elm Campbell, Tina Marie Campbell, Janice Caruso, Glenn Chisholm, Karma Chisholm, April Cleary, Jonathan Cleary, Brian Gregory Clyburn, Jamie Johanna Coates, Michael Collins, Shannon Denise Collins, David Aaron Crow, Carlos Cruz, Jessica Novak Cruz, Joel C. Cruz, Judith Sara Darrough, Robert Charles Darrough, Derrick Anthony Davis, Kelli Dodge, Tiffany Dotson, E.N.R., Brian Edward Ellis, Julie Ann Ellis, Victor Raymond Ellis, Dennis John Elm, Donna Lee Elm, Matthew Elm, Louella E. Frison, Garrett Layne Funk, G.A.S., G.S.(y and through his next friend Georganne M. Siercks), Charmaine Renee Gilbert, Jordan Gilbert, Patricia Goins, Paul Edward Goins, III, Erin Nicole Goss, Ann L. Gould, James A. Gould, Carol Griffin, Daniel Griffin, Matt Griffin, Shawn Patrick Griffin, H.R., Stephanie Hager, Jerry Hardison, Justina Hardison, Teresa Hardison, Ashley Michelle Harris, Felicia Ann Harris, Sorainya Harris, Tennyson Charles Harris, Alex Henigan, Michelle Hock, Trecia Brock Hood, Ronald Paul Hopkins, Adam Matthew Jayne, Paul Elmer Jayne, Christopher Wayne Johnson, K.K., Angela Kahler, Barclay Kamaleson, Cade Kamaleson, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Nicole Kamaleson, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Kevin King, Abby Knapp-Morris, Brandon Korona, L.A.E.L.B., Brian Lambka, Jordan Lambka, Douglas A. Landphair, Jean S. Landphair, Meredith Landphair, C. Richard Looney, Martha Looney, M.G.C., M.M., Martin E. Madden, Martin P. Madden, Pamela J. Madden, Lindsey R. Maldonado, Karyn Stone Marta, Lawrence Marta, Taylor Marta, Suzanne Renae Martinez, Lisa Martinusen, Ranee Massoni, Cody Cheyenne Mays, Tammy Renee Mays, Thomas Pierce Mays, Sonja McDaniel, Kathleen McEvoy, Michelle Rose McEvoy, Patrick Charles McEvoy, Shannon K. McNulty, Marie Sentina Mielke, Stephanie Ann Miller, Beverly Mills, Alexander Lee Mittler, Cristine Mittler, Terry Mittler, Gabriel Negron, Jose Negron, Maribel Negron, Marvin Negron, Amanda Newman, Donald Edward Newman, Sr, Brandon Nichols, Cynthia Nichols, Douglas Nichols, Susan Novak, Dan Olmstead, Tammy Olmstead, Christa L. Osborn, Creighton David Osborn, Kade M. Osborn, Katlyn M. Osborn, P.A.D., Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua, Felicia Gross Paniagua, Socorro Gross Paniagua, David L. Parker, Jordan Plunk, Justin T. Plunk, Christopher Powers, Thomas Priolo, Janice H. Proctor, JD Prosser, R.G., R.X.C., Dana Rainey, Christine Rangel, Blaine A. Redding, David Reed, Heather L. Reed, Linda Reynolds, Cassie Marie Richardson, Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr, Sheila Ristaino, Randy Ristau, Suzanne Ristau, Jannett Cecilia Roberts, Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts, Alyson Overman Rodgers, Leslie Rodriguez, Angel R. Roldan, Lieselotte R. Roldan, Matthias P. Roldan, Samantha G. Roldan, Michelle Carolina Rotelli, Michael Rufus, II, Stephanie Rufus, S.L.B., S.L.L.B., Brandon Tyler Schmidt, Leeann Schmidt, Phillip J. Schmidt, Wendy Shedd, Georganne M. Siercks, Kent Alan Skeens, Sherry A. Skeens, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Mary Beth Smedinghoff, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Thomas Smedinghoff, Martha Carolina Smith, Adrian Carrillo Soltero, Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr, Maria Soltero, Erik Sparks, Garry Lee Sparks, Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks, Jane Sparks, Zachary Douglas Sparks, Annette Spehar, Jacob Louis Spehar, Luke Spehar, Patrick Spehar, Mitchell L. Stambaugh, Bob Surprenant, Kristie Surprenant, Freddie Dewey Sutton, Harriet Sutton, Summer Breanne Sutton, Julianna Symkowiak, T.L.S., Evelyn Taylor, Jasmine Thomas, Diane Timoney, Gregory Timoney, Ryan Gregory Timoney, Marta Torres, Gloria Diane Trelfa, Joyce L. Turner, Luann Varney, Barry Welch, Lorria Welch, Zackary Welch, Colleen Whipple, David Whipple, Kimberley A. Whipple, Sean Whipple, Thomas Elmer Wickliff, Glenda Willard, Clarence Williams, Jr, Samantha Shervon Williams, Talisa Shervon Williams, Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne, Z.R.S., Baily Zimmerman, Chris Lee Zimmerman, Michelle Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Sparacino, Ryan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Habib Bank Limited..(pc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Habib Bank Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Katherine Abreu-Border, Jose Aleman, Vanessa Marie Anzures, B.C.D., Misty Marie Barclay, Scott Bennedsen, Tracy Bennedsen, Brianna N. Benson, Frederick C. Benson, Catherine Elm Boatwright, Janice Harriman Bryant, Natasha Buchanan, William Michael Burley, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, August Cabrera, Corbin Cabrera, Daniel Matias Cabrera, Gillian Leigh Cabrera, Robert Cabrera, Arthur Campbell, Audrey Campbell, Margaret Elm Campbell, Tina Marie Campbell, Janice Caruso, Glenn Chisholm, Karma Chisholm, April Cleary, Jonathan Cleary, Brian Gregory Clyburn, Jamie Johanna Coates, Michael Collins, Shannon Denise Collins, David Aaron Crow, Carlos Cruz, Jessica Novak Cruz, Joel C. Cruz, Judith Sara Darrough, Robert Charles Darrough, Derrick Anthony Davis, Kelli Dodge, Tiffany Dotson, E.N.R., Brian Edward Ellis, Julie Ann Ellis, Victor Raymond Ellis, Dennis John Elm, Donna Lee Elm, Matthew Elm, Louella E. Frison, Garrett Layne Funk, G.A.S., G.S.(y and through his next friend Georganne M. Siercks), Charmaine Renee Gilbert, Jordan Gilbert, Patricia Goins, Paul Edward Goins, III, Erin Nicole Goss, Ann L. Gould, James A. Gould, Carol Griffin, Daniel Griffin, Matt Griffin, Shawn Patrick Griffin, H.R., Stephanie Hager, Jerry Hardison, Justina Hardison, Teresa Hardison, Ashley Michelle Harris, Felicia Ann Harris, Sorainya Harris, Tennyson Charles Harris, Alex Henigan, Michelle Hock, Trecia Brock Hood, Ronald Paul Hopkins, Adam Matthew Jayne, Paul Elmer Jayne, Christopher Wayne Johnson, K.K., Angela Kahler, Barclay Kamaleson, Cade Kamaleson, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Nicole Kamaleson, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Kevin King, Abby Knapp-Morris, Brandon Korona, L.A.E.L.B., Brian Lambka, Jordan Lambka, Douglas A. Landphair, Jean S. Landphair, Meredith Landphair, C. Richard Looney, Martha Looney, M.G.C., M.M., Martin E. Madden, Martin P. Madden, Pamela J. Madden, Lindsey R. Maldonado, Karyn Stone Marta, Lawrence Marta, Taylor Marta, Suzanne Renae Martinez, Lisa Martinusen, Ranee Massoni, Cody Cheyenne Mays, Tammy Renee Mays, Thomas Pierce Mays, Sonja McDaniel, Kathleen McEvoy, Michelle Rose McEvoy, Patrick Charles McEvoy, Shannon K. McNulty, Marie Sentina Mielke, Stephanie Ann Miller, Beverly Mills, Alexander Lee Mittler, Cristine Mittler, Terry Mittler, Gabriel Negron, Jose Negron, Maribel Negron, Marvin Negron, Amanda Newman, Donald Edward Newman, Sr, Brandon Nichols, Cynthia Nichols, Douglas Nichols, Susan Novak, Dan Olmstead, Tammy Olmstead, Christa L. Osborn, Creighton David Osborn, Kade M. Osborn, Katlyn M. Osborn, P.A.D., Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua, Felicia Gross Paniagua, Socorro Gross Paniagua, David L. Parker, Jordan Plunk, Justin T. Plunk, Christopher Powers, Thomas Priolo, Janice H. Proctor, JD Prosser, R.G., R.X.C., Dana Rainey, Christine Rangel, Blaine A. Redding, David Reed, Heather L. Reed, Linda Reynolds, Cassie Marie Richardson, Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr, Sheila Ristaino, Randy Ristau, Suzanne Ristau, Jannett Cecilia Roberts, Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts, Alyson Overman Rodgers, Leslie Rodriguez, Angel R. Roldan, Lieselotte R. Roldan, Matthias P. Roldan, Samantha G. Roldan, Michelle Carolina Rotelli, Michael Rufus, II, Stephanie Rufus, S.L.B., S.L.L.B., Brandon Tyler Schmidt, Leeann Schmidt, Phillip J. Schmidt, Wendy Shedd, Georganne M. Siercks, Kent Alan Skeens, Sherry A. Skeens, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Mary Beth Smedinghoff, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Thomas Smedinghoff, Martha Carolina Smith, Adrian Carrillo Soltero, Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr, Maria Soltero, Erik Sparks, Garry Lee Sparks, Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks, Jane Sparks, Zachary Douglas Sparks, Annette Spehar, Jacob Louis Spehar, Luke Spehar, Patrick Spehar, Mitchell L. Stambaugh, Bob Surprenant, Kristie Surprenant, Freddie Dewey Sutton, Harriet Sutton, Summer Breanne Sutton, Julianna Symkowiak, T.L.S., Evelyn Taylor, Jasmine Thomas, Diane Timoney, Gregory Timoney, Ryan Gregory Timoney, Marta Torres, Gloria Diane Trelfa, Joyce L. Turner, Luann Varney, Barry Welch, Lorria Welch, Zackary Welch, Colleen Whipple, David Whipple, Kimberley A. Whipple, Sean Whipple, Thomas Elmer Wickliff, Glenda Willard, Clarence Williams, Jr, Samantha Shervon Williams, Talisa Shervon Williams, Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne, Z.R.S., Baily Zimmerman, Chris Lee Zimmerman, Michelle Zimmerman..(Singh, Tejinder)
June 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 7, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Kevin King, Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts, Barclay Kamaleson, David Whipple, Douglas A. Landphair, Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua, Shannon K. McNulty, Paul Elmer Jayne, Ronald Paul Hopkins, H.R., Marta Torres, Gloria Diane Trelfa, Brianna N. Benson, Diane Timoney, Jasmine Thomas, Sorainya Harris, Vanessa Marie Anzures, Michelle Carolina Rotelli, Terry Mittler, Angela Kahler, Sean Whipple, Matthias P. Roldan, Michelle Hock, Leeann Schmidt, Shawn Patrick Griffin, Cynthia Nichols, R.X.C., Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne, Tiffany Dotson, Stephanie Ann Miller, Donald Edward Newman, Sr, Bob Surprenant, Jerry Hardison, R.G., Natasha Buchanan, Martin P. Madden, Gillian Leigh Cabrera, Zachary Douglas Sparks, K.K., Adrian Carrillo Soltero, Michelle Rose McEvoy, G.S., Blaine A. Redding, Janice H. Proctor, Karyn Stone Marta, Socorro Gross Paniagua, August Cabrera, Martha Looney, Meredith Landphair, Mitchell L. Stambaugh, E.N.R., Maribel Negron, Baily Zimmerman, Barry Welch, Beverly Mills, Jordan Plunk, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Janice Harriman Bryant, Julianna Symkowiak, Louella E. Frison, Tracy Bennedsen, Heather L. Reed, Maria Soltero, Alyson Overman Rodgers, Dan Olmstead, S.L.B., Erik Sparks, M.G.C., Susan Novak, Cody Cheyenne Mays, April Cleary, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Tammy Olmstead, Creighton David Osborn, Teresa Hardison, Jane Sparks, Ranee Massoni, Kristie Surprenant, Christopher Powers, Alexander Lee Mittler, Suzanne Renae Martinez, Wendy Shedd, Samantha G. Roldan, Michael Rufus, II, Jordan Lambka, Brian Lambka, Alex Henigan, Garrett Layne Funk, Karma Chisholm, Corbin Cabrera, Samantha Shervon Williams, Patrick Spehar, Marie Sentina Mielke, Phillip J. Schmidt, Jose Negron, Kent Alan Skeens, Pamela J. Madden, Jordan Gilbert, Matthew Elm, Mary Beth Smedinghoff, Matt Griffin, Victor Raymond Ellis, Tina Marie Campbell, Summer Breanne Sutton, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Lorria Welch, Talisa Shervon Williams, Justin T. Plunk, Luann Varney, Lawrence Marta, Carlos Cruz, Brian Gregory Clyburn, Jacob Louis Spehar, Angel R. Roldan, Ryan Gregory Timoney, Brandon Nichols, Georganne M. Siercks, Brandon Tyler Schmidt, Douglas Nichols, Leslie Rodriguez, Joyce L. Turner, Patricia Goins, Z.R.S., Charmaine Renee Gilbert, Jannett Cecilia Roberts, Shannon Denise Collins, Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr, Robert Cabrera, Derrick Anthony Davis, C. Richard Looney, James A. Gould, Michelle Zimmerman, Sheila Ristaino, Arthur Campbell, Catherine Elm Boatwright, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Freddie Dewey Sutton, Felicia Gross Paniagua, Sherry A. Skeens, Lieselotte R. Roldan, S.L.L.B., Robert Charles Darrough, Margaret Elm Campbell, Christopher Wayne Johnson, Luke Spehar, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Thomas Elmer Wickliff, Kathleen McEvoy, Jose Aleman, Patrick Charles McEvoy, JD Prosser, Sonja McDaniel, Kimberley A. Whipple, David Aaron Crow, Zackary Welch, Marvin Negron, Dennis John Elm, P.A.D., Lindsey R. Maldonado, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, Adam Matthew Jayne, Christine Rangel, Glenda Willard, Jessica Novak Cruz, Katherine Abreu-Border, Cristine Mittler, Nicole Kamaleson, Joel C. Cruz, David Reed, Frederick C. Benson, Glenn Chisholm, Justina Hardison, Martha Carolina Smith, Carol Griffin, Randy Ristau, Christa L. Osborn, Daniel Matias Cabrera, Katlyn M. Osborn, Brian Edward Ellis, Thomas Pierce Mays, Trecia Brock Hood, David L. Parker, Misty Marie Barclay, Kelli Dodge, Abby Knapp-Morris, Janice Caruso, Audrey Campbell, Harriet Sutton, Judith Sara Darrough, Ashley Michelle Harris, Garry Lee Sparks, B.C.D., Linda Reynolds, Cassie Marie Richardson, Jonathan Cleary, Gregory Timoney, Erin Nicole Goss, Dana Rainey, Julie Ann Ellis, Amanda Newman, Stephanie Rufus, Lisa Martinusen, Paul Edward Goins, III, Kade M. Osborn, Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks, Michael Collins, Annette Spehar, Martin E. Madden, Thomas Priolo, Colleen Whipple, William Michael Burley, Felicia Ann Harris, Taylor Marta, Scott Bennedsen, Stephanie Hager, Tammy Renee Mays, Clarence Williams, Jr, Gabriel Negron, Daniel Griffin, Tennyson Charles Harris, L.A.E.L.B., Thomas Smedinghoff, Donna Lee Elm, Brandon Korona, Jean S. Landphair, Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr, Suzanne Ristau, Jamie Johanna Coates, T.L.S., Cade Kamaleson, G.A.S., M.M., Chris Lee Zimmerman, Evelyn Taylor, Ann L. Gould added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Kevin King, Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts, Barclay Kamaleson, David Whipple, Douglas A. Landphair, Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua, Shannon K. McNulty, Paul Elmer Jayne, Ronald Paul Hopkins, H.R., Marta Torres, Gloria Diane Trelfa, Brianna N. Benson, Diane Timoney, Jasmine Thomas, Sorainya Harris, Vanessa Marie Anzures, Michelle Carolina Rotelli, Terry Mittler, Angela Kahler, Sean Whipple, Matthias P. Roldan, Michelle Hock, Leeann Schmidt, Shawn Patrick Griffin, Cynthia Nichols, R.X.C., Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne, Tiffany Dotson, Stephanie Ann Miller, Donald Edward Newman, Sr, Bob Surprenant, Jerry Hardison, R.G., Natasha Buchanan, Martin P. Madden, Gillian Leigh Cabrera, Zachary Douglas Sparks, K.K., Adrian Carrillo Soltero, Michelle Rose McEvoy, G.S., Blaine A. Redding, Janice H. Proctor, Karyn Stone Marta, Socorro Gross Paniagua, August Cabrera, Martha Looney, Meredith Landphair, Mitchell L. Stambaugh, E.N.R., Maribel Negron, Baily Zimmerman, Barry Welch, Beverly Mills, Jordan Plunk, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Janice Harriman Bryant, Julianna Symkowiak, Louella E. Frison, Tracy Bennedsen, Heather L. Reed, Maria Soltero, Alyson Overman Rodgers, Dan Olmstead, S.L.B., Erik Sparks, M.G.C., Susan Novak, Cody Cheyenne Mays, April Cleary, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Tammy Olmstead, Creighton David Osborn, Teresa Hardison, Jane Sparks, Ranee Massoni, Kristie Surprenant, Christopher Powers, Alexander Lee Mittler, Suzanne Renae Martinez, Wendy Shedd, Samantha G. Roldan, Michael Rufus, II, Jordan Lambka, Brian Lambka, Alex Henigan, Garrett Layne Funk, Karma Chisholm, Corbin Cabrera, Samantha Shervon Williams, Patrick Spehar, Marie Sentina Mielke, Phillip J. Schmidt, Jose Negron, Kent Alan Skeens, Pamela J. Madden, Jordan Gilbert, Matthew Elm, Mary Beth Smedinghoff, Matt Griffin, Victor Raymond Ellis, Tina Marie Campbell, Summer Breanne Sutton, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Lorria Welch, Talisa Shervon Williams, Justin T. Plunk, Luann Varney, Lawrence Marta, Carlos Cruz, Brian Gregory Clyburn, Jacob Louis Spehar, Angel R. Roldan, Ryan Gregory Timoney, Brandon Nichols, Georganne M. Siercks, Brandon Tyler Schmidt, Douglas Nichols, Leslie Rodriguez, Joyce L. Turner, Patricia Goins, Z.R.S., Charmaine Renee Gilbert, Jannett Cecilia Roberts, Shannon Denise Collins, Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr, Robert Cabrera, Derrick Anthony Davis, C. Richard Looney, James A. Gould, Michelle Zimmerman, Sheila Ristaino, Arthur Campbell, Catherine Elm Boatwright, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Freddie Dewey Sutton, Felicia Gross Paniagua, Sherry A. Skeens, Lieselotte R. Roldan, S.L.L.B., Robert Charles Darrough, Margaret Elm Campbell, Christopher Wayne Johnson, Luke Spehar, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Thomas Elmer Wickliff, Kathleen McEvoy, Jose Aleman, Patrick Charles McEvoy, JD Prosser, Sonja McDaniel, Kimberley A. Whipple, David Aaron Crow, Zackary Welch, Marvin Negron, Dennis John Elm, P.A.D., Lindsey R. Maldonado, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, Adam Matthew Jayne, Christine Rangel, Glenda Willard, Jessica Novak Cruz, Katherine Abreu-Border, Cristine Mittler, Nicole Kamaleson, Joel C. Cruz, David Reed, Frederick C. Benson, Glenn Chisholm, Justina Hardison, Martha Carolina Smith, Carol Griffin, Randy Ristau, Christa L. Osborn, Daniel Matias Cabrera, Katlyn M. Osborn, Brian Edward Ellis, Thomas Pierce Mays, Trecia Brock Hood, David L. Parker, Misty Marie Barclay, Kelli Dodge, Abby Knapp-Morris, Janice Caruso, Audrey Campbell, Harriet Sutton, Judith Sara Darrough, Ashley Michelle Harris, Garry Lee Sparks, B.C.D., Linda Reynolds, Cassie Marie Richardson, Jonathan Cleary, Gregory Timoney, Erin Nicole Goss, Dana Rainey, Julie Ann Ellis, Amanda Newman, Stephanie Rufus, Lisa Martinusen, Paul Edward Goins, III, Kade M. Osborn, Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks, Michael Collins, Annette Spehar, Martin E. Madden, Thomas Priolo, Colleen Whipple, William Michael Burley, Felicia Ann Harris, Taylor Marta, Scott Bennedsen, Stephanie Hager, Tammy Renee Mays, Clarence Williams, Jr, Gabriel Negron, Daniel Griffin, Tennyson Charles Harris, L.A.E.L.B., Thomas Smedinghoff, Donna Lee Elm, Brandon Korona, Jean S. Landphair, Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr, Suzanne Ristau, Jamie Johanna Coates, T.L.S., Cade Kamaleson, G.A.S., M.M., Chris Lee Zimmerman, Evelyn Taylor, Ann L. Gould. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Singh, Tejinder)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Singh, Tejinder)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Habib Bank Limited. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20134272)Document filed by Kevin King..(Singh, Tejinder)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Habib Bank Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin King
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Spehar
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kade M. Osborn
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina C. Smedinghoff
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Edward Goins, III
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Sparks
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Elmer Jayne
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Alan Skeens
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Nichols
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick C. Benson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Breanne Sutton
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Nichols
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Marie Anzures
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean S. Landphair
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennyson Charles Harris
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.K.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Landphair
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Renee Mays
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Michelle Harris
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hock
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aaron Crow
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Soltero
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice H. Proctor
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Louis Spehar
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Gross Paniagua
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Aleman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Lee Mittler
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeann Schmidt
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark T. Smedinghoff
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Martinusen
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justina Hardison
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin P. Madden
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.L.L.B.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn Stone Marta
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Lee Sparks
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce L. Turner
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gregory Timoney
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Patrick Griffin
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Alfonso Soltero, Sr.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Olmstead
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha G. Roldan
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Paul Kamaleson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Paul Hopkins
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Tyler Schmidt
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Sentina Mielke
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Carolina Rotelli
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Elmer Wickliff
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Diane Trelfa
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.R.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Charles Darrough
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyson Overman Rodgers
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Rainey
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luann Varney
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannett Cecilia Roberts
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmitt Dwayne Burns
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry A. Skeens
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Reynolds
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Gilbert
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Carolina Smith
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talisa Shervon Williams
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Dodge
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Ellis
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Carrillo Soltero
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Matias Cabrera
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Collins
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creighton David Osborn
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cleary
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann L. Gould
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Edward Newman, Sr.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gregory Clyburn
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Olmstead
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Timoney
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sorainya Harris
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rose McEvoy
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Madden
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Rangel
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Novak
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Campbell
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis John Elm
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Johanna Coates
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Smedinghoff
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Kamaleson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Nicole Goss
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corbin Cabrera
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Negron
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Spehar
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Benjamin Gross Rios, Sr.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Mittler
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Goins
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Gould
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Griffin
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Powers
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hardison
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Abreu-Border
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Campbell
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.S.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georganne M. Siercks
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barclay Kamaleson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.L.B.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baily Zimmerman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J. Schmidt
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackary Welch
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine A. Redding
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.X.C.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon K. McNulty
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Bennedsen
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lee Elm
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.R.S.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Nichols
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Thomas
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lambka
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna N. Benson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Matthew Jayne
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Ristaino
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Knapp-Morris
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Negron
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Lee Zimmerman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Spehar
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather L. Reed
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katlyn M. Osborn
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Shervon Williams
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Marie Richardson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.C.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Marie Barclay
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja McDaniel
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Hardison
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Gross Paniagua
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Sutton
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin T. Plunk
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthias P. Roldan
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Negron
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine Renee Gilbert
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Marie Hurnblad Sparks
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin E. Madden
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley A. Whipple
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Edward Ellis
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Elm Boatwright
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell L. Stambaugh
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Ann Harris
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abrill Renee Williams-Osbourne
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Benjamin Gross Paniagua
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karma Chisholm
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trecia Brock Hood
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Shedd
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD Prosser
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Zimmerman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cabrera
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Surprenant
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Newman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louella E. Frison
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Dotson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Elm
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rodriguez
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rufus
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rufus, II
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Novak Cruz
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wayne Johnson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Surprenant
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pierce Mays
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.G.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Timoney
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Harriman Bryant
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.N.R.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Charles McEvoy
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Smedinghoff
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Campbell
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Marta
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey R. Maldonado
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Cleary
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whipple
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cade Kamaleson
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Cheyenne Mays
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Lambka
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel R. Roldan
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Buchanan
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Ristau
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hager
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Griffin
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Willard
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillian Leigh Cabrera
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Landphair
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristine Mittler
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Michael Burley
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A.E.L.B.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Sara Darrough
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August Cabrera
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen McEvoy
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.C.D.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.A.S.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Welch
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Mills
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Denise Collins
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorria Welch
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Chisholm
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Plunk
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Douglas Sparks
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Looney
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Elm Campbell
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Dewey Sutton
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieselotte R. Roldan
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Negron
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Korona
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Richard Looney
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan M. Smedinghoff
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Whipple
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Torres
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Parker
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Whipple
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianna Symkowiak
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Priolo
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel C. Cruz
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Cruz
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Kahler
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Nathaniel Roberts
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.A.D.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.L.S.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Reed
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Henigan
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Griffin
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Taylor
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Caruso
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Renae Martinez
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Anthony Davis
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa L. Osborn
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Ristau
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranee Massoni
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ann Miller
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Marta
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Bennedsen
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Sparks
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Layne Funk
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Ryan Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habib Bank Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?