Daou et al v. BLC Bank, S.A.L. et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH A. DAOU and KAREN M. DAOU
Defendant: AL-MAWARID BANK, S.A.L., Banque du Liban, CREDIT LIBANAIS, S.A.L. and BLC BANK, S.A.L.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04438
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Credit Libanais, S.A.L...(Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BLC Bank, S.A.L...(Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline A. Fish on behalf of BLC Bank, S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L...(Fish, Caroline)
August 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey David Rotenberg on behalf of BLC Bank, S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L...(Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Attachment of Real and Personal Property of Defendants BLC Bank S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L., and AL-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L.. Responses due by 10/9/2020 Replies due by 10/30/2020. (tro)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER with respect to #24 Motion to Attach of Real and Personal Property of Defendants BLC Bank S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L., and AL-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants shall file any opposition to the plaintiffs' July 30 motion by October 9, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed by October 30, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of the July 30 motion and this Order on each of the defendants and file proof of service on the public docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel who have not filed a notice of appearance shall promptly do so. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/31/2020) (tro)
July 30, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Joseph Daou in Support re: #24 MOTION for Attachment of Real and Personal Property of Defendants BLC Bank S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L., and AL-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L... Document filed by Joseph A. Daou, Karen M. Daou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21).(Major, Christopher)
July 30, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Christopher J. Major in Support re: #24 MOTION for Attachment of Real and Personal Property of Defendants BLC Bank S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L., and AL-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L... Document filed by Joseph A. Daou, Karen M. Daou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30).(Major, Christopher)
July 30, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION for Attachment of Real and Personal Property of Defendants BLC Bank S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L., and AL-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L.. . Document filed by Joseph A. Daou, Karen M. Daou..(Major, Christopher)
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Attachment of Real and Personal Property of Defendants BLC Bank S.A.L., Credit Libanais, S.A.L., and AL-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L.. Document filed by Joseph A. Daou, Karen M. Daou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Attachment).(Major, Christopher)
July 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L. answer due 10/9/2020; BLC Bank, S.A.L. answer due 10/9/2020; Credit Libanais, S.A.L. answer due 10/9/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2020. Responses due by 10/30/2020 Replies due by 11/13/2020. (jca)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part #22 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants BLC Bank, Credit Libanais, and Al-Mawarid Bank. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Commercial Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 9, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should the Commercial Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, the plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by October 30, 2020. It is unlikely that the plaintiffs will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should the plaintiffs oppose any motion to dismiss the complaint rather than file an amended complaint, such opposition shall be filed by October 30, 2020. The Commercial Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by November 13, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the initial conference scheduled for September 10 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/24/2020) (jca)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants BLC Bank, Credit Libanais, and Al-Mawarid Bank addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Gassan A. Baloul dated July 22, 2020. Document filed by Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L...(Baloul, Gassan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L...(Baloul, Gassan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Stewart Alonzo on behalf of Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L...(Alonzo, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Rand Berger on behalf of Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L...(Berger, Mitchell)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gassan Adnan Baloul on behalf of Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L...(Baloul, Gassan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Credit Libanais, S.A.L. served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. Service was accepted by Elie Younes, attorney-in-fact. Document filed by Joseph A. Daou; Karen M. Daou..(Major, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. BLC Bank, S.A.L. served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. Service was accepted by Rita Khalil, employee in the legal department. Document filed by Joseph A. Daou; Karen M. Daou..(Major, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Banque du Liban served on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. Service was accepted by Karen Jabbour and Robert Merhi, employees. Document filed by Joseph A. Daou; Karen M. Daou..(Major, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L. served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. Service was accepted by Nadine Fayad, lawyer. Document filed by Joseph A. Daou; Karen M. Daou..(Major, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the initial pretrial conference will be held telephonically. Prior to the date of the conference, counsel for all parties shall register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Counsel for all parties are directed to participate in the initial pretrial conference at the time and using the dial-in instructions listed below. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 conference, and to prepare and file a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are not required to participate in the conference, provided that a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination is filed prior to the date of the conference via e-mail to the Orders and Judgments Clerk at the following e-mail address: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. All conferences with the Court are scheduled for a specific time; there is no other matter scheduled for that time; and counsel are directed to be available promptly. The attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel must participate in the conference. Requests for adjournment shall be made no later than four business days before the conference and shall be made in a letter filed on ECF in accordance with the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions. The written submission must (a) specify the reasons for the adjournment, (b) state whether the other parties have consented, and (c) indicate times and dates on succeeding Fridays when all counsel are available. Unless counsel are notified that the conference has been adjourned it will be held as scheduled. YOU ARE DIRECTED (i) TO SO NOTIFY ALL ATTORNEYS IN THIS ACTION BY SERVING UPON EACH OF THEM A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES FORTHWITH, AND (ii) TO FILE PROOF OF SUCH NOTICE WITH THE COURT. IF YOU ARE UNAWARE OF THE IDENTITY OF COUNSEL FOR ANY OF THE PARTIES, YOU MUST FORTHWITH SEND A COPY OF THE NOTICE AND PRACTICES TO THAT PARTY PERSONALLY. DATE OF CONFERENCE: SEPTEMBER 10, 2020 AT 3 P.M. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749. Access code: 4324948. The parties shall use a landline if one is available. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/16/2020) (gr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Ariel Henry on behalf of Joseph A. Daou, Karen M. Daou..(Henry, Leah)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eva Marie Sullivan on behalf of Joseph A. Daou, Karen M. Daou..(Sullivan, Eva)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Libanais, S.A.L...(pc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLC Bank, S.A.L...(pc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Al-Mawarid Bank, S.A.L...(pc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banque du Liban..(pc)
June 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher John Major. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOSEPH A. DAOU, KAREN M. DAOU, AL-MAWARID BANK, S.A.L., BLC BANK, S.A.L., CREDIT LIBANAIS, S.A.L. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BANQUE DU LIBAN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JOSEPH A. DAOU, KAREN M. DAOU..(Major, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AL-MAWARID BANK, S.A.L., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JOSEPH A. DAOU, KAREN M. DAOU..(Major, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CREDIT LIBANAIS, S.A.L., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JOSEPH A. DAOU, KAREN M. DAOU..(Major, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLC BANK, S.A.L., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JOSEPH A. DAOU, KAREN M. DAOU..(Major, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Major, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AL-MAWARID BANK, S.A.L., BLC BANK, S.A.L., Banque du Liban, CREDIT LIBANAIS, S.A.L.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20189246)Document filed by JOSEPH A. DAOU, KAREN M. DAOU..(Major, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daou et al v. BLC Bank, S.A.L. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AL-MAWARID BANK, S.A.L.
Represented By: Joseph Stewart Alonzo
Represented By: Mitchell Rand Berger
Represented By: Gassan Adnan Baloul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banque du Liban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREDIT LIBANAIS, S.A.L.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Rotenberg
Represented By: Caroline A. Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLC BANK, S.A.L.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Rotenberg
Represented By: Caroline A. Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH A. DAOU
Represented By: Christopher John Major
Represented By: Eva Marie Sullivan
Represented By: Leah Ariel Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN M. DAOU
Represented By: Christopher John Major
Represented By: Eva Marie Sullivan
Represented By: Leah Ariel Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?