Genao v. New York City Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Elvin Genao
Defendant: New York City Housing Authority and Division of Human Rights
Case Number: 1:2020cv04445
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Elvin Genao at 237 West 127th Street, Apt. 14C, New York, NY 10027. (dsh)
June 16, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order of Dismissal, to Elvin Genao at 237 West 127th Street, Apt. 14C, New York, NY 10027. (dsh)
June 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that under the June 5, 2019 order in Genao v. Saint Pauls Church, ECF 1:19-CV-2704, 6 (S.D.N.Y. June 5, 2019), the Court dismisses the complaint without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/11/2020) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Appeal Package) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651: On June 5, 2019, the Court barred Plaintiff from filing any new federal civil action in forma pauperis (IFP) without first obtaining from the Court leave to file. See Genao v. Saint Pauls Church, ECF 1:19-CV-2704, 6 (S.D.N.Y. June 5, 2019). Plaintiff files this new pro se case, seeks IFP status, and has not sought leave from the Court. This action is therefore dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the June 5, 2019 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/11/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Division of Human Rights, New York City Housing Authority. Document filed by Elvin Genao. (Attachments: #1 Main Document) (sac)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Elvin Genao. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genao v. New York City Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Human Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Genao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?