In Re: Richards et al
Appellant: Carole Richards
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association, Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04468
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Carole Richards. Appellee Brief due by 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Bankruptcy case 17-12378 Docket Sheet, SDNY Bankruptcy Court, #2 Exhibit 2. Second Amended Docket Sheet re MFSJ (Doc 148), #3 Exhibit 3. Statement of Issue re MFSJ, by appellant, #4 Exhibit 4. Counter Statement of the issue to be presented on appeal, Appellees, #5 Exhibit 5. Bankruptcy Court transcript 3.26.2020, #6 Exhibit 6. Appellant's Memorandum of Law to reopen the adversary proceeding to reargue and reverse the court's order granting the appellees' MFSJ and dismissing the adversary proceeding, #7 Exhibit 7. Appellees' (Defendants) combined opposition to appellant's motion to reopen the adversary proceeding to reargue and reverse the bankruptcy court's orders denying appellant's motion to expunge, and granting appellees' motion for summary judgment, #8 Exhibit 8. Appellant's reply to Appellees' combined opposition, #9 Exhibit 9. Court transcript 5.14.2020, #10 Exhibit 10. Certificate of compliance, #11 Exhibit 11. Appendix).(Randolph, M)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Carole Richards. Appellee Brief due by 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Bankruptcy Case 17-12378 Docket Sheet, SDNY Bankruptcy Court, #2 Exhibit 2. Second Amended Docket Sheet re MFSJ (Doc 148), #3 Exhibit 3. Statement of Issue re MFSJ, by appellant (Doc 139), #4 Exhibit 4. Counter Statement of the issue to be presented on appeal, Appellees (Doc 146), #5 Exhibit 5. Court transcript 3.26.2020, #6 Exhibit 6. Appellant's Memorandum of Law to reopen the adversary proceeding to reargue and reverse the court's to grant the appellees' MFSJ and dismiss the adversary proceeding, #7 Exhibit 7. Appellee's (Defendants) combined opposition to Appellees' motion(s), #8 Exhibit 8. Appellant's reply to Appellees' combined opposition, #9 Exhibit 9. Court transcript 5.14.2020, #10 Exhibit 10. Certificate of Compliance).(Randolph, M)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. (bkar)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Carole Richards. (bkar)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (bkar)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Appellant's Stipulated Application for Extension of the Current Due Dates in the Briefing Schedule. Granted. Appellant Brief due by 7/17/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/28/2020. Responses to Brief due by 8/14/2020. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/6/2020) (jca)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Appellant's Stipulated Application for Extension of the Current Due Dates in the Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from M. Bradford Randolph and Christopher A. Lynch dated July 2, 2020. Document filed by Carole Richards..(Randolph, M)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Carole Richards. (bkar)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Carole Richards. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues)(bkar)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the appellant file its brief by June 26, 2020. The appellees shall file their opposition brief by July 10. The appellant's reply brief, if any, must be filed by July 24. ( Appellant Brief due by 6/26/2020., Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/24/2020., Responses to Brief due by 7/10/2020) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/19/20) (yv)
June 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
June 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 18, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-04412-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
June 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-4412. Document filed by Carole Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bkar)
June 11, 2020 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 20-cv-4412. (bkar)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bkar)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated May 19, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1647A, 17-B-12378 (CGM). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Carole Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Richards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carole Richards
Represented By: M Bradford Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Christopher A. Lynch
Represented By: Brian Patrick Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp.
Represented By: Christopher A. Lynch
Represented By: Brian Patrick Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher A. Lynch
Represented By: Brian Patrick Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?