Isaac Hager v. Steele et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Isaac Hager
Defendant: Jay F Steele, Steele Consulting, LLC and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv04482
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332ed
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #24 Letter filed by Steele Consulting, LLC, Jay F Steele, ENDORSEMENT: An initial pretrial conference will be held on August 13, 2020, at 10:50 a.m. on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code 558-3333. The timing of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/4/2020) ( Initial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (ks)
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly G. Rogers dated 8/3/2020 re: requesting initial case conference. Document filed by Jay F Steele, Steele Consulting, LLC..(Gydus, Holly)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Remand to State Court. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to remand is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 9. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/29/2020) (cf)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. The mediation shall be completed by September 30, 2020. To the extent possible, the mediation program shall appoint a mediator with experience in employment law. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/7/2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/28/2020) (cf)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after August 14, 2020 without leave of the Court. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than: November 30, 2020. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by November 30, 2020. This case is to be tried by a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3-4 days. On January 5, 2021 at 10:00 A.M., a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Joinder of Parties due by 8/14/2020. Deposition due by 11/30/2020. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/28/2020) (cf)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the July 30, 2020, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. It is further ORDERED, that, regarding settlement discussions, the parties shall be referred for mediation. The referral will issue in a separate order. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/28/2020) (cf)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly G. Rogers dated 7/23/2020 re: Initial Pre-Trial Conference Letter. Document filed by Jay F Steele, Steele Consulting, LLC..(Gydus, Holly)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from nkereuwem Umoh dated 07/22/2020 re: wrongly filed letter. Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager..(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
July 20, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #18 LETTER MOTION. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ldi)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Holly G. Rogers in Opposition re: #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Jay F Steele, Steele Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C).(Gydus, Holly)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jay F. Steele in Opposition re: #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Jay F Steele, Steele Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E).(Gydus, Holly)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Jay F Steele, Steele Consulting, LLC..(Gydus, Holly)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 16, 2020, is adjourned to July 30, 2020, at 10:50 a.m. The parties' pre-conference materials are due at least seven days before the conference, or by July 23, 2020. Initial Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/7/2020) (cf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager..(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Nkereuwem Umoh in Support re: #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Rachel Isaac Hager in Support re: #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C).(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager..(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
June 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/29/2020. (rjm)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Nkereuwem Umoh dated June 26, 2020. Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' pre-motion letter is adjourned sine die. Plaintiff shall file the motion to remand today, June 29, 2020. Per Individual Rule III.B.4, any opposition or reply memoranda of law shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 6.1. The parties are reminded that, per the Order at Dkt. No. 6, the initial pretrial conference is scheduled for July 16, 2020, and pre-conference materials are due July 9, 2020. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/29/2020) (rjm)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Nkereuwem Umoh dated June 26, 2020. Document filed by Rachel Isaac Hager..(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at July 16, 2020 at 10:50 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/25/2020) (jca)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Letter filed by Steele Consulting, LLC, Jay F Steele. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file a response to this letter by June 26, 2020, in accordance with Individual Rule III.A.1 and III.C.2. The letters will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference to be scheduled. A Scheduling Order will issue separately. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/19/2020) (js)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Holly G. Rogers dated 6/18/2020 re: Pre-motion letter regarding Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss. Document filed by Jay F Steele, Steele Consulting, LLC..(Gydus, Holly)
June 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nkereuwem Inyang Umoh on behalf of Rachel Isaac Hager..(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gydus, Holly)
June 12, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents DOES 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Steele Consulting, LLC, Jay F Steele. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,..(Gydus, Holly)
June 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Holly Genevieve Gydus to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Holly Genevieve Gydus re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 652061/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20216950).Document filed by Steele Consulting, LLC, Jay F Steele. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D).(Gydus, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac Hager v. Steele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay F Steele
Represented By: Holly Genevieve Gydus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steele Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Holly Genevieve Gydus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Isaac Hager
Represented By: Nkereuwem Inyang Umoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?