Villalva v. Spaha Pizza LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bernardo Villalva
Defendant: Charles Devigne, Spaha Pizza LLC d/b/a Lexington Pizza and Spaha Pizza LLC doing business as Lexington Pizza
Case Number: 1:2020cv04491
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/8/2020..(rpr)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/3/2020) (rpr)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Devigne, Spaha Pizza LLC..(Cutro, James)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Spaha Pizza LLC..(Cutro, James)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Charles Devigne served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. Service was accepted by Caleb. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Bernardo Villalva..(Nardo, Raymond)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Spaha Pizza LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service was accepted by Caleb. Document filed by Bernardo Villalva..(Nardo, Raymond)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Devigne, Spaha Pizza LLC..(jgo)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nardo, Raymond)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spaha Pizza LLC d/b/a Lexington Pizza, Charles Devigne, as an individual, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bernardo Villalva..(Nardo, Raymond)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Raymond Nardo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Spaha Pizza LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Raymond Nardo to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): do not file other documents as attachments to the summons request. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Raymond Nardo to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the PDF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spaha Pizza LLC d/b/a Lexington Pizza, Charles Devigne, as an individual, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bernardo Villalva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Nardo, Raymond) Modified on 6/12/2020 (pne).
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Devigne, Spaha Pizza LLC d/b/a Lexington Pizza. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20218608)Document filed by Bernardo Villalva..(Nardo, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villalva v. Spaha Pizza LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Devigne
Represented By: James John Cutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaha Pizza LLC d/b/a Lexington Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaha Pizza LLC doing business as Lexington Pizza
Represented By: James John Cutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Villalva
Represented By: Raymond Nardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?