Guzman v. Mi Pueblito, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Guzman
Defendant: Mi Pueblito, Ignacio Flores and Mi Pueblito Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04495
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Ignacio Flores served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service was accepted by Ignacio Flores. Document filed by Bonifacio Guzman..(Nardo, Raymond)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Mi Pueblito Inc. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service was accepted by Ignacio Flores. Document filed by Bonifacio Guzman..(Nardo, Raymond)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/15/2020) (jwh)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ignacio Flores, Mi Pueblito Inc...(jgo)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nardo, Raymond)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mi Pueblito, Inc., Ignacio Flores, as an individual, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bonifacio Guzman..(Nardo, Raymond)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Raymond Nardo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mi Pueblito was modified to Mi Pueblito, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Raymond Nardo to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): do not file other documents as attachments to the summons request. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Raymond Nardo to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the PDF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mi Pueblito, Inc., Ignacio Flores, as an individual, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bonifacio Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Nardo, Raymond) Modified on 6/12/2020 (pne).
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ignacio Flores, Mi Pueblito. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20219210)Document filed by Bonifacio Guzman..(Nardo, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Mi Pueblito, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi Pueblito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignacio Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi Pueblito Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Guzman
Represented By: Raymond Nardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?