Valente v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Edward Valente
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04500
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: PLAINTIFF HEREBY VOLUNTARILY DISMISSES the above-captioned action with prejudice as to Defendant, METRO-NORTH RAILROAD COMPANY, without costs, fees or disbursement to either party as against the other, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED., Metro-North Railroad Company terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/30/2020) (rj)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Metro-North Railroad Company. Document filed by Edward Valente. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Dell, Carol)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: For the reasons discussed at the conference on June 13, 2020, Plaintiff's motion for immediate injunctive relief is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/15/2020) (rro)
June 13, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Defendant Metro-North Commuter Railroad's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request For Injunctive Relief. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company..(Abramson, Neil)
June 13, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Affidavit of Andrew Paul. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14).(Abramson, Neil)
June 13, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Affidavit of Catherine Rinaldi. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part A, #2 Exhibit 1, Part B).(Abramson, Neil)
June 13, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Affidavit of Michael Shiffer, PhD. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company..(Abramson, Neil)
June 13, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #18) - RESPONSE re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Affidavit of Catherine Rinaldi. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part A, #2 Exhibit 1, Part B).(Abramson, Neil) Modified on 6/15/2020 (ldi).
June 13, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transit Authority for Metro-North Railroad Company. Document filed by Metro-North Railroad Company..(Abramson, Neil)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: As discussed with the parties, the Court will hold a telephone conference on June 13, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. to discuss Plaintiff's motion for immediate injunctive relief. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 1015508 SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/12/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 6/13/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (ks)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Edward Valente in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Edward Valente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B., #3 Exhibit C., #4 Exhibit D., #5 Exhibit E., #6 Exhibit F., #7 Exhibit G., #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W).(Dell, Carol)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Matthew Mitchell in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol)
June 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Railroad Company..(pne)
June 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Carol G. Dell, Esq. in Support re: #8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil Howard Abramson on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company..(Abramson, Neil)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Meredith Morgan on behalf of Edward Valente..(Morgan, Katherine)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Giuliano Dell on behalf of Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dell, Carol)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20223445)Document filed by Edward Valente..(Dell, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valente v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Valente
Represented By: Katherine Meredith Morgan
Represented By: Carol Giuliano Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Represented By: Neil Howard Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?