Gross v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Abraham Gross
Defendant: Brenda Rosen, Gabriel Mombrun, Vanessa Cucurulo, James E. Johnson, Marageret Brown, Samantha Schonfeld, Stephanie Labarta, Victor Hernandez, Louise Carroll, Babba Halm, Anna-Marie Hendrickson, Shatara Pell, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, The City of New York, Jeanne-Marie Williams, Edwin Lugo, Nidia Dormi, Helen Rosenthal, Terresa Palmieri, Harold Weinberg, Nick Lundgren, Travis Fong and Breaking Ground
Case Number: 1:2020cv04515
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Mailed a copy of #9 Order, to Abraham Gross, 40 W 77 Street, Apt. 10C, New York, NY 10024.(vn)
July 7, 2020 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #9 Order to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (nb)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On June 25, 2020, the Court dismissed the complaint without prejudice as duplicative of Plaintiff's pending complaint under case number 20-CV-4340. On July 6, 2020, the Court denied Plaintiff's request for reconsideration of the dismissal order. But on the same day, Plaintiff submitted to the Court a request for an order to show cause seeking preliminary injunctive relief. (ECF No. 8.) As this case is closed, the Court denies Plaintiff's request for an order to show cause as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. All other pending matters are terminated. As provided in the July 6, 2020 order, the Court will not accept further documents under this docket number expect for those directed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. (See ECF No. 7.) The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/7/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 7, 2020 Mailed a copy of #7 Order to Abraham Gross at 40 W 77 Street Apt. 10C New York, NY 10024. (aan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION & TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Abraham Gross, Abraham Gross..(sc)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's request for reconsideration (ECF No. 6) is denied. All other pending matters are terminated. The Clerk of Court is further directed to accept no further submissions under this docket number, except for papers directed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/6/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Abraham Gross, dated 6/26/20 re: The Order of Dismissal issued yesterday is based on a fatal clerical error. It would be an extraoridinary injustice to allow for this mistake to be ratified. The dismissal order states that case 20cv4515-CM is dismissed since I had previously filed "the same claims against the same defendants" in case 20-cv-4340(CM). I never filed case number 20cv4340 etc. Document filed by Abraham Gross.(sc)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the pending action under case number 20-CV-4340 (CM). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/25/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 Appeal Package) (nb).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff, appearing pro se, brings this action alleging that Defendants violated his rights in connection with housing. For the following reasons, the complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff has submitted to this Court a substantially similar complaint that is pending under case number 20-CV-4340 (CM). Because this complaint raises the same claims against the same defendants, no useful purpose would be served by the further litigation of this duplicate lawsuit. Therefore, this action is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's pending action under case number 20-CV-4340 (CM).1 The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice as duplicative. All other pending matters are terminated. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/25/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Abraham Gross consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Abraham Gross. (sac)
June 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Breaking Ground, Marageret Brown, Louise Carroll, Vanessa Cucurulo, Nidia Dormi, Travis Fong, Babba Halm, Anna-Marie Hendrickson, Victor Hernandez, James E. Johnson, Stephanie Labarta, Edwin Lugo, Nick Lundgren, Gabriel Mombrun, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, Terresa Palmieri, Shatara Pell, Brenda Rosen, Helen Rosenthal, Samantha Schonfeld, The City of New York, Harold Weinberg, Jeanne-Marie Williams. Document filed by Abraham Gross. (sac)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Abraham Gross. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Mombrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Cucurulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marageret Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Labarta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babba Halm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna-Marie Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shatara Pell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne-Marie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nidia Dormi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terresa Palmieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breaking Ground
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?