King v. White et al
Plaintiff: Sharif King
Defendant: Correction Captain John Doe #1, John Doe #4, The City of New York, Correction Captain John Doe #2, John Doe #3 and Correction Officer White
Case Number: 1:2020cv04527
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Mailed a copy of #14 Order via UPS Next Day Air, to Sharif King at DIN No. 18A4833, Great Meadow Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 50, Comstock, NY 12825. (dsh)
July 24, 2020 Mailed a copy of #14 Order, to Sharif King at DIN No. 18A4833, Great Meadow Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 50, Comstock, NY 12825. (dsh)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. This resolves Dkt. No. 10. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and in forma pauperis status is thus denied. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court will mail him a copy of this Order and note that mailing on the public docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/23/2020) (ks)
July 20, 2020 Mailed a copy of #12 Order of Service, #2 Complaint to the New York City Law Department at 100 Church Street, New York, N.Y. 10007. (bwa)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Sharif King DIN No. 18A4833, at Great Meadow Correctional Facility P.O. Box 50 Comstock, NY 12825, on 7/20/2020 Re: #12 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (bwa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to the New York City Law Department at: 100 Church Street, New York, N.Y. 10007. The Clerk of Court is further directed to electronically notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Defendants the City of New York and Correction Officer White waive service of summons. SO ORDERED. Waiver of Service due by 8/17/2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/17/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/17/2020) (rjm)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Sharif King, with attached Affirmation. (sc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from S. King dated 6/25/20 re: I received your 6/15/20 dated order instructing me to resubmit the IFP Application as the "Storative page was missing." Please note that, while I have since sent the Court a new application, the IFP I originally submitted did indeed contain the signature page. The original IFP Application was a two-sided document etc. Document filed by Sharif King.(sc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITH PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS(REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS). Document filed by Sharif King.(sc)
July 7, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
July 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
July 2, 2020 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Sharif King at DIN No. 18A4833, Great Meadow Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 50, Comstock, NY 12825 and to Warden/Superintendent of Great Meadow Correctional Facility at 11739 State Route 22, P.O. Box 51, Comstock, NY 12821-0051. (dsh)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/2/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Sharif King..(sc)
June 16, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Sharif King at DIN No. 18A4833, Great Meadow Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 50, Comstock, NY 12825. (dsh)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 7/15/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 7/15/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/15/20) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp) (bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Sharif King. (sac)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, The City of New York, White. Document filed by Sharif King. (sac)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Sharif King. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Captain John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Captain John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharif King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?