Hillel v. Obvio Health USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Iris Hillel
Defendant: Dikla Shpangental, Michael Shleifer, Prasanna Pitale, SPRIM Americas, Inc., Anand Tharmaratnam, Alistair Grenfell, IQVIA, Inc., Obvio Health USA, Inc., Obvio Health Pte. Ltd. and Ivan Jarry
Case Number: 1:2020cv04647
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ivan Jarry(in his professional capacities) waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020; Ivan Jarry(in his individual capacities) waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ivan Jarry(in his professional capacities), Ivan Jarry(in his individual capacities)..(jgo)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ivan Jarry, in his individual and professional capacities, re: #25 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Alistair Grenfell(in his professional capacities), Alistair Grenfell(in his individual capacities), IQVIA, Inc., Obvio Health Pte. Ltd., Obvio Health USA, Inc., Prasanna Pitale(in his professional capacities), Prasanna Pitale(in his individual capacities), SPRIM Americas, Inc., Michael Shleifer(in his individual capacities), Michael Shleifer(in his professional capacities), Dikla Shpangental(in her individual capacities), Dikla Shpangental(in her professional capacities), Anand Tharmaratnam(in his professional capacities), Anand Tharmaratnam(in his individual capacities), Ivan Jarry, Ivan Jarry with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Iris Hillel. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Willemin, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff, Iris Hillel, counsel for Defendants IQVIA, Inc., Prasanna Pitale, Alistair Grenfell, Anand Tharmaratnam and Dikla Shpangental and counsel for Defendants Obvio Health USA, Inc., Obvio Health Pte. Ltd. SPRIM Americas, Inc. and Michael Shleifer that the below deadlines in the above-captioned action shall be, upon permission of the Court, extended as follows: (As further set forth herein this Stipulation.) SO ORDERED. Alistair Grenfell(in his professional capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; Alistair Grenfell(in his individual capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; IQVIA, Inc. answer due 8/31/2020; Obvio Health Pte. Ltd. answer due 8/31/2020; Obvio Health USA, Inc. answer due 8/31/2020; Prasanna Pitale(in his professional capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; Prasanna Pitale(in his individual capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; SPRIM Americas, Inc. answer due 8/31/2020; Michael Shleifer(in his individual capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; Michael Shleifer(in his professional capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; Dikla Shpangental(in her individual capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; Dikla Shpangental(in her professional capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; Anand Tharmaratnam(in his professional capacities) answer due 8/31/2020; Anand Tharmaratnam(in his individual capacities) answer due 8/31/2020.( Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2020. Responses due by 7/30/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/22/2020) (va)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, Oppose Motion to Dismiss and file Answer addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Lindsay M. Goldbrum dated July 21, 2020. Document filed by Iris Hillel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Goldbrum, Lindsay)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Alistair Grenfell(in his professional capacities) served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; Alistair Grenfell(in his individual capacities) served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. Service was accepted by Alistair Grenfell. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Dikla Shpangental(in her individual capacities) served on 7/5/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; Dikla Shpangental(in her professional capacities) served on 7/5/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service was accepted by Dikla Shpangental. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. IQVIA, Inc. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. Service was accepted by Sylvia Finch, Associate Financial Analysis. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Anand Tharmaratnam(in his professional capacities) served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020; Anand Tharmaratnam(in his individual capacities) served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. Service was accepted by Anand Tharmaratnam. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Goldbrum, Lindsay)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Prasanna Pitale(in his professional capacities) served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020; Prasanna Pitale(in his individual capacities) served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. Service was accepted by Prasanna Pitale. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Goldbrum, Lindsay)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent IQVIA Holdings Inc. for IQVIA, Inc.. Document filed by IQVIA, Inc...(Taber, Kenneth)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria T Galeno on behalf of IQVIA, Inc...(Galeno, Maria)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #17) - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by IQVIA, Inc...(Taber, Kenneth) Modified on 7/9/2020 (ldi).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument in connection with Defendant IQVIA Inc's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kenneth W. Taber dated July 8, 2020. Document filed by IQVIA, Inc...(Taber, Kenneth)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by IQVIA, Inc...(Taber, Kenneth)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by IQVIA, Inc...(Taber, Kenneth)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Edward Strand on behalf of Obvio Health Pte. Ltd., Obvio Health USA, Inc., SPRIM Americas, Inc., Michael Shleifer(in his individual capacities), Michael Shleifer(in his professional capacities)..(Strand, David)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Obvio Health Pte. Ltd. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020; Obvio Health USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020; SPRIM Americas, Inc. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020; Michael Shleifer(in his individual capacities) waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020; Michael Shleifer(in his professional capacities) waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alistair Grenfell(in his professional capacities), Alistair Grenfell(in his individual capacities), IQVIA, Inc., Prasanna Pitale(in his professional capacities), Prasanna Pitale(in his individual capacities), Dikla Shpangental(in her individual capacities), Dikla Shpangental(in her professional capacities), Anand Tharmaratnam(in his professional capacities), Anand Tharmaratnam(in his individual capacities)..(pc)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Obvio Health Pte. Ltd...(pc)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Obvio Health USA, Inc., SPRIM Americas, Inc., Michael Shleifer(in his individual capacities), Michael Shleifer(in his professional capacities)..(pc)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Michelle Goldbrum on behalf of Iris Hillel..(Goldbrum, Lindsay)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IQVIA, Inc., Prasanna Pitale, Alistair Grenfell, Dikla Shpangental, Anand Tharmaratnam, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Obvio Health Pte. Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Obvio Health USA, Inc., SPRIM Americas, Inc., Michael Shleifer, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Willemin, Michael)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alistair Grenfell(in his professional capacities), Alistair Grenfell(in his individual capacities), IQVIA, Inc., Obvio Health Pte. Ltd., Obvio Health USA, Inc., Prasanna Pitale(in his professional capacities), Prasanna Pitale(in his individual capacities), SPRIM Americas, Inc., Michael Shleifer(in his individual capacities), Michael Shleifer(in his professional capacities), Dikla Shpangental(in her individual capacities), Dikla Shpangental(in her professional capacities), Anand Tharmaratnam(in his professional capacities), Anand Tharmaratnam(in his individual capacities). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20300007)Document filed by Iris Hillel..(Willemin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillel v. Obvio Health USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dikla Shpangental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shleifer
Represented By: David Edward Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prasanna Pitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRIM Americas, Inc.
Represented By: David Edward Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Tharmaratnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alistair Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQVIA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth William Taber
Represented By: Maria T Galeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obvio Health USA, Inc.
Represented By: David Edward Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obvio Health Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: David Edward Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Jarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Hillel
Represented By: Michael John Willemin
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Goldbrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?