Yeremis v. Amerit Fleet Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Arturo Yeremis
Defendant: City of New York Police Department, A-1 All German Car Corporation, Charter Communications Inc and Amerit Fleet Solutions
Case Number: 1:2020cv04723
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331w
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Compel. On July 28, 2020, Plaintiff filed an emergency motion to compel Defendant Amerit Fleet Solutions ("Amerit") to grant Plaintiff access to his locker to retrieve his personal property. Dkt. No. 8. That application is DENIED without prejudice. Because Amerit has not appeared in this case and, to the Court's knowledge, has not been served, Plaintiff is directed to pursue the requested relief via order to show cause. Plaintiff is directed to follow the procedures described in Rule 4(C) of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases and Rule 4 of the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendants and to file proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/29/2020) (mro)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION to Compel Amerit Fleet Solutions to Retrieve person items . Document filed by Arturo Yeremis..(Zack, Leonard)
July 9, 2020 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE EMAILED TO U.S.M.: on 7/9/2020 Re: Judge Gregory H. Woods #7 Order. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Complaint, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Amerit Fleet Solutions, Charter Communications, A-1 All German Car Corp., City of New York Police Dept. (bwa)
July 9, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A-1 All German Car Corporation, Amerit Fleet Solutions, Charter Communications Inc, City of New York Police Department. (bwa)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Amerit Fleet Solutions, Charter Communications Inc., A-1 All German Car Corporation, and City of New York Police Department and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/8/2020) (kv) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/28/2020) (mro)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/28/2020) (mro)
June 24, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge P. Kevin Castel is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zack, Leonard)
June 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Leonard Zack. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: arturo yeremis; AMERIT FlEET Solution; Charter Communications Inc; A-1 ALL GERMAN CAR CORPORATION; City of New York Police Department. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
June 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Leonard Zack. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $600,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
June 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Leonard Zack to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Nature of Suit codes were selected; Jury Demand code was not selected; Citizenship Plaintiff and Defendant codes must only be selected when Diversity Basis of Jurisdiction code is selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by arturo yeremis..(Zack, Leonard)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zack, Leonard) Modified on 6/22/2020 (jgo).
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-1 ALL GERMAN CAR CORPORATION, AMERIT FlEET Solution, Charter Communications Inc, City of New York Police Department. Document filed by arturo yeremis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Documents, #2 Exhibit A-1 ALL German Car Corp Company Card).(Zack, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeremis v. Amerit Fleet Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 All German Car Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerit Fleet Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Yeremis
Represented By: Leonard Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?