Pavon Hernandez et al v. Gemini Diner Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Pavon Hernandez, Alejandro Pavon and Alexis Bravo
Defendant: Christos Argyros, Gemini Diner Inc., Nikolaos Argyros, Constantinos Kassimis and Gemini Diner Inc. doing business as Gemini Diner
Case Number: 1:2020cv04741
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clela Alice Errington on behalf of Alexis Bravo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alexis Bravo(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(Individually)..(Errington, Clela)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nikolaos Argyros..(jgo)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gemini Diner Inc...(jgo)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Constantinos Kassimis..(jgo)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christos Argyros..(jgo)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nikolaos Argyros, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexis Bravo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alexis Bravo(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christos Argyros, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexis Bravo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alexis Bravo(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Constantinos Kassimis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexis Bravo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alexis Bravo(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/22/2020) (ks)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christos Argyros, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexis Bravo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alexis Bravo(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jgo).
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gemini Diner Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexis Bravo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alexis Bravo(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(Individually), Alejandro Pavon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
June 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christos Argyros, Nikolaos Argyros, Gemini Diner Inc., Constantinos Kassimis. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20342175)Document filed by Alexis Bravo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Pavon(Individually), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Pavon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jorge Pavon Hernandez(Individually), Alexis Bravo(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pavon Hernandez et al v. Gemini Diner Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christos Argyros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Diner Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolaos Argyros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constantinos Kassimis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Diner Inc. doing business as Gemini Diner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Pavon Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clela Alice Errington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Pavon
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clela Alice Errington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Bravo
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clela Alice Errington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?