Silverman v. Deluxe Building Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elyse Silverman
Defendant: Deluxe Building Solutions LLC and Jacob Frydman
Case Number: 1:2020cv04842
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Deluxe Building Solutions, LLC and Jacob Frydman.(km)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Elyse Silverman..(Kleinman, Randy) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIRMATION of Randy E. Kleinman in Support re: #10 Affidavit of Service Complaints, #11 Affidavit of Service Complaints, #12 Affidavit of Service Complaints. Document filed by Elyse Silverman..(Kleinman, Randy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Elyse Silverman. Related Document Number: #4 ..(Kleinman, Randy) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/20/2020 (km).
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Randy Kleinman. RE-FILE Document No. #14 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate needs to be filed under proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default. (km)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 9/25/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/28/2020) (kv)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Deluxe Building Solutions LLC served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Elyse Silverman..(Kleinman, Randy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Deluxe Building Solutions LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service was accepted by Tamara Winkom. Document filed by Elyse Silverman..(Kleinman, Randy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jacob Frydman served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Elyse Silverman..(Kleinman, Randy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Frydman. (sj)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacob Frydman, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Elyse Silverman..(Kleinman, Randy)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deluxe Building Solutions LLC. (sj)
July 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randy Edward Kleinman to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, Waiver of Service Unexecuted. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party as to whom the summons request is for must be listed in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacob Frydman, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Elyse Silverman..(Kleinman, Randy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Elyse Silverman., WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED. Document filed by Elyse Silverman.(Kleinman, Randy) Modified on 7/1/2020 (sj).
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20419891)Document filed by Elyse Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Kleinman, Randy)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kleinman, Randy)
June 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Bradley Gerstman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the filing attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bradley Gerstman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
June 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bradley Gerstman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
June 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 25, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST AND SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20402661)Document filed by Elyse Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Gerstman, Bradley) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jgo).
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gerstman, Bradley) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverman v. Deluxe Building Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deluxe Building Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Frydman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elyse Silverman
Represented By: Bradley Gerstman
Represented By: Randy Edward Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?