Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. v. Pixels.com, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Authentic Brands Group, LLC, TheMaven, Inc., ABG-SI LLC and Pixels.com, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04880
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund John Ferdinand, III on behalf of Pixels.com, LLC, TheMaven, Inc...(Ferdinand, Edmund)
July 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund John Ferdinand, III on behalf of ABG-SI LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC..(Ferdinand, Edmund)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/17/2020) ABG-SI LLC answer due 8/28/2020; Authentic Brands Group, LLC answer due 8/28/2020; Pixels.com, LLC answer due 8/26/2020; TheMaven, Inc. answer due 8/28/2020 (ks)
July 17, 2020 Filing 21 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rothman, Joel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alexander Malbin dated July 16, 2020. Document filed by ABG-SI LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Pixels.com, LLC, TheMaven, Inc...(Malbin, Alexander)
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Rudolf Malbin on behalf of ABG-SI LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Pixels.com, LLC, TheMaven, Inc...(Malbin, Alexander)
July 14, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Pixels.com, LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service was accepted by Drew D. - Person in Charge. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TheMaven, Inc. served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. Service was accepted by Robin Huttbanks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ABG-SI LLC served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. Service was accepted by Lynann Gares - Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Authentic Brands Group, LLC served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. Service was accepted by Lynann Gares - Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/7/2020) (nb) Modified on 7/7/2020 (tro).
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Joel B. Rothman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-04735; 1:20-cv-04893; and 1:20-cv-04875. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pixels.com, LLC..(pc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABG-SI LLC..(pc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Authentic Brands Group, LLC..(pc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TheMaven, Inc...(pc)
June 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Office was not selected. (pc)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ABG-SI, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Authentic Brands Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TheMaven, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pixels.com, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc...(Rothman, Joel)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rothman, Joel)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rothman, Joel) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pc).
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABG-SI LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Pixels.com, LLC, TheMaven, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20421839)Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration).(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. v. Pixels.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authentic Brands Group, LLC
Represented By: Edmund John Ferdinand, III
Represented By: Alexander Rudolf Malbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TheMaven, Inc.
Represented By: Edmund John Ferdinand, III
Represented By: Alexander Rudolf Malbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABG-SI LLC
Represented By: Edmund John Ferdinand, III
Represented By: Alexander Rudolf Malbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixels.com, LLC
Represented By: Edmund John Ferdinand, III
Represented By: Alexander Rudolf Malbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?