Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. v. Ains Nashville, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
Defendant: Michael A. Naselli, Ronbon, LLC d/b/a The Ainsworth, Ains Nashville, LLC d/b/a THE AINSWORTH, BRIAN MAZZA, AINS HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, Fondue 26, LLC, Matthew Shendell, Ronbon, LLC doing business as The Ainsworth, Fondue 26, LLC doing business as The Ainsworth, Ains Nashville, LLC doing business as The Ainsworth and Matthew P. Shendell
Petitioner: Donald Guerrazzi
Case Number: 1:2020cv04896
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael A. Naselli answer due 8/31/2020. (nb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION ENLARGING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT: Plaintiff, AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., and Defendant, MICHAEL A. NASELLI, by and through the undersigned, hereby enter into this Joint Stipulation to enlarge the time for Defendant, MICHAEL A. NASELLI, to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint such that Defendant, MICHAEL A. NASELLI, shall have until and including August 31, 2020, to file his response to Plaintiffs Complaint. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/20/2020) (nb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael A. Naselli..(Guerrazzi, Donald)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Guerrazzi on behalf of Michael A. Naselli..(Guerrazzi, Donald)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Donald Guerrazzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
August 12, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 AMENDED MOTION for Donald Guerrazzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED MOTION for Donald Guerrazzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald Guerrazzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Attorney Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Guerrazzi, Donald)
August 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #25 MOTION for Donald Guerrazzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21096120. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Donald Guerrazzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21096120. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael A. Naselli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Attorney Affidavit).(Guerrazzi, Donald) Modified on 8/11/2020 (vba).
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Michael A. Naselli served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service was accepted by Victoria Naselli - Wife. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION ENLARGING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT:, Motions terminated: #22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Matthew J. Keating, Esq. dated July 21, 2020. filed by Ains Holding Company, LLC. It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between all of the parties to this stipulation that the time of the defendants, AINS NASHVILLE, LLC d/b/a THE AINSWORTH, AINS HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, FONDUE 26, LLC d/b/a THE AINSWORTH, RONBON LLC d/b/a THE AINSWORTH and MATTHEW P. SHENDELL, to answer the plaintiff's Complaint is enlarged on consent to and including August 31, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/22/2020) Ains Holding Company, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Ains Nashville, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Fondue 26, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Ronbon, LLC answer due 8/31/2020; Matthew P. Shendell answer due 8/31/2020. (ks)
July 21, 2020 Filing 22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Matthew J. Keating, Esq. dated July 21, 2020. Document filed by Ains Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Keating, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew John Keating on behalf of Fondue 26, LLC..(Keating, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew John Keating on behalf of Ronbon, LLC, Matthew P. Shendell..(Keating, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew John Keating on behalf of Ains Holding Company, LLC, Ains Nashville, LLC..(Keating, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Brian Mazza served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Brian Mazza, Defendant. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ains Nashville, LLC served on 7/11/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service was accepted by Matthew P. Shendell, Managing Agent. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Matthew P. Shendell served on 7/11/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service was accepted by Matthew P. Shendell, Defendant. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ronbon, LLC served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. Service was accepted by Sean McKenzie, Managing Agent. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Fondue 26, LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ains Holding Company, LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ains Holding Company, LLC, Ains Nashville, LLC, Fondue 26, LLC, Brian Mazza, Michael A. Naselli, Ronbon, LLC, Matthew P. Shendell..(sj)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ains Nashville, LLC d/b/a The Ainsworth, Ains Holding Company, LLC, Fondue 26, LLC d/b/a The Ainsworth, Ronbon, LLC d/b/a The Ainsworth, Brian Mazza, Michael A. Naselli and Matthew P. Shendell, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Francis Kye to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; all defendant names do not fit properly in caption; use the name of the first listed defendant followed by 'et al'; you may also file a single summons request and attach a rider/addendum listing the name(s) and address(es) of the defendant(s), and write "See Attached" in the 'To' field. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
June 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Francis Kye. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $248,964,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $249,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
June 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Matthew Francis Kye. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ains Holding Company, LLC, Ains Nashville, LLC, Fondue 26, LLC, Ronbon, LLC, Brian Mazza, Matthew P. Shendell. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
June 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kye, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew P. Shendell, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pne).
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael A. Naselli, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pne).
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Mazza, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pne).
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ronbon, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pne).
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fondue 26, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pne).
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ains Holding Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pne).
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ains Nashville, LLC d/b/a The Ainsworth, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc...(Kye, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (pne).
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AINS HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, Ains Nashville, LLC d/b/a THE AINSWORTH, Fondue 26, LLC, BRIAN MAZZA, Michael A. Naselli, Ronbon, LLC d/b/a The Ainsworth, Matthew Shendell. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20424965)Document filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E).(Kye, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. v. Ains Nashville, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Naselli
Represented By: Donald Guerrazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronbon, LLC d/b/a The Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ains Nashville, LLC d/b/a THE AINSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN MAZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AINS HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Matthew John Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fondue 26, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronbon, LLC doing business as The Ainsworth
Represented By: Matthew John Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fondue 26, LLC doing business as The Ainsworth
Represented By: Matthew John Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ains Nashville, LLC doing business as The Ainsworth
Represented By: Matthew John Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew P. Shendell
Represented By: Matthew John Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Francis Kye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Guerrazzi
Represented By: Donald Guerrazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?