Franklin v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. et al
Case Number: |
1:2020cv04935 |
Filed: |
September 11, 2020 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 17, 2022 |
Filing
71
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all previously scheduled conferences and other deadlines are CANCELLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs (including attorneys' fees) to either party. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate all open motions and to CLOSE the case. Within 30 days of this order, the parties may apply to reopen this case. Any such application must show good cause for holding the case open in light of the pa rties' settlement and must be filed within 30 days. Any request filed after 30 days or without a showing of good cause may be denied solely on that basis. Additionally, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce their settlement agreement, they must submit within the same 30-day period: (1) their settlement agreement to the Court in accordance with Rule 7.A of the Court's Individual Practices and (2) a request that the Court issue an order expressly retaining jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354 (2d Cir. 2015). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/17/2022) (tg)
|
May 10, 2022 |
Filing
67
ORDER denying without prejudice 66 Letter Motion for Discovery. Application DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to quash is not in compliance with the Court's Individual Practices with respect to discovery disputes. See Rule 3(B) of the Undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Plaintiff is welcome to re-raise the discovery dispute with the Court in compliance with Rule 3(B), which requires that Plaintiff's counsel first meet and confer in good faith with opposing counsel, among other requirements. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at docket entry 66. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/10/2022) (tg) Modified on 5/10/2022 (tg).
|
April 22, 2022 |
Filing
65
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/22/2022) (tg)
|
April 6, 2022 |
Filing
59
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for the reasons stated at the conference, discovery is bifurcated into individual and class components. The Court will enter a Case Management Plan ("CMP") by separate order; the discovery deadlines in the CMP relate only to the individual claims of the named Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/6/2022) (tg)
|
January 26, 2022 |
Filing
52
OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED. The Court will refer the parties to the Court-annexed Mediation Program by separate order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motions at docket entries 33 and 42. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/26/2022) (tg)
|
September 29, 2020 |
Filing
27
ORDER: denying as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff is to file a redlined version of its amended complaint, comparing the amended complaint to the original complaint, by no later than Wednesday, September 30, 2020. Fil ing a redlined version of an amended pleading is requiredby Individual Practice Rule 4(E)(i). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby denied as moot. The Court of Court is respectfully requested to terminate docket entry 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/29/2020) (ama)
|
September 11, 2020 |
Filing
22
ORDER: WHEREAS the parties appeared for an initial pre-trial conference on Friday, September 11, 2020; and WHEREAS the Plaintiff indicated that he will be filing an Amended Complaint by no later than Friday, September 25, 2020; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT discovery is stayed pending the filing of an Amended Complaint and the resolution of a subsequent Motion to Dismiss, were one to be filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT if the parties do decide that they wish to convene a settlement conference, they must submit a joint letter and this Court will issue a referral to Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman for a settlement conference. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2020.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/11/2020) (nb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?