Lamb v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Richard Maxwell Lamb
Defendant: Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc. and Paul Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv05234
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties and their respective counsel, that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, against the Defendants, Paul Johnson and Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc. pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Paul Johnson and Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/24/2020) (jwh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Paul Johnson, Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Richard Maxwell Lamb. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Wilson-Milne, Katherine)
August 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Russell Morris. RE-FILE Document No. #12 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation needs to have handwritten signatures of the attorneys. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
August 23, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc., Paul Johnson pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc., Paul Johnson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Morris, Russell) Modified on 8/24/2020 (km).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiff and Counsel for Defendants, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to Wednesday, August 26, 2020. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants hereby accept service of the Summons and Complaint, and waive any argument with regards to defective service of process. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiff and Counsel for Defendants, that Defendants currently possess certain works by Plaintiff (the "Disputed Works") and Defendants agree not to move, sell, destroy, or otherwise dispose of the Disputed Works during the pendency of this litigation absent Court Order or the written permission of Plaintiff. So Ordered., Motions terminated: #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Russell D. Morris dated August 13, 2020. filed by Paul Johnson, Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/20) (yv)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Lane Wilson-Milne on behalf of Richard Maxwell Lamb..(Wilson-Milne, Katherine)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Russell D. Morris dated August 13, 2020. Document filed by Paul Johnson, Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint).(Morris, Russell)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Paul Johnson served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Richard Maxwell Lamb..(Schindler, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc. served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty - Secretary of State Employee. Document filed by Richard Maxwell Lamb..(Schindler, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Johnson, Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc...(dnh)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Johnson and Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Maxwell Lamb..(Schindler, Steven)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Paul Johnson, Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc.. Document filed by Richard Maxwell Lamb..(Schindler, Steven)
July 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven R. Schindler. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,900,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,900,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven R. Schindler to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; filed against parties must be individually selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven R. Schindler to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Johnson and Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Maxwell Lamb..(Schindler, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2020 (jgo).
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schindler, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20600568)Document filed by Richard Maxwell Lamb..(Schindler, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamb v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Trading Gallery, Inc.
Represented By: Russell D. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Russell D. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Maxwell Lamb
Represented By: Steven R. Schindler
Represented By: Katherine Lane Wilson-Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?