January 17, 2023 |
Filing
83
ORDER: The Court is conducting a review of its docket and making inquiry into cases where there has been no recent activity. The present case appears to fall into that category. Accordingly, the parties are directed to file a letter within Seven (7 ) Days (either jointly or separately) reporting on the status of the current litigation. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of the above-captioned case for failure to prosecute. If the case settled please submit stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/17/2023) BY ECF TO ALL PARTIES (kv)
|
March 4, 2022 |
Filing
76
DECISION AND ORDER DISPOSING OF OBJECTIONS TO RULING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON THIRD PARTY MOTION TO QUASH re: 74 Letter filed by Felix Gonzalez, Securitas Electronic Security, Inc., 63 Objection (non-motion) filed by Felix Gonzalez, Secur itas Electronic Security, Inc., 61 Order on Motion to Add Applicant, Order on Motion to Quash. For the reasons stated below, the court affirms five of Judge Fox's seven rulings, reverses two of them, and reinstates the subpoena to the extent indicated below. JMC has twenty business days from the date of this decision to provide the relevant documents to Securitas. (as further set forth herein). As so modified, the order of Magistrate Judge Fox is affirmed. To the request in Securitas' letter of inquiry dated March 3, 2022 (Dkt No. 74), the four months run from today. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/4/2022) (kv)
|
February 17, 2022 |
Filing
70
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT re: 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint . filed by Felix Gonzalez, Securitas Electronic Security, Inc.. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion is GRANT ED. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file the Proposed Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 57-1) as an Amended Complaint on the docket for this case. Plaintiffs December 27, 2021 consent letter request to extend the discovery period for a period of four months from the disposition of this motion (Dkt. No. 68) is GRANTED. Discovery is extended until June 17, 2022. Defendant's request for leave to serve new discovery demands (Dkt. No. 62) in order to defend against Plaintiffs newly asserted breac h of contract claim is GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. This is a written opinion. The Clerk is directed to close the open motion at Docket Number 57. (Discovery due by 6/17/2022.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/17/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL (kv)
|
September 29, 2021 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 51 Motion to Add ; granting 51 Motion to Quash. For the foregoing reasons, the movant's motion to quash the subpoena, Docket Entry No. 51, is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 9/29/2021) (va)
|
September 3, 2021 |
Filing
48
ORDER: Non-party Jeffrey Management Corp.'s letter-motion requesting permission to move to quash a subpoena or for a protective order, Docket Entry No. 44, is granted. The parties' letter-motion for an extension of deadlines for pretria l activities, Docket Entry No. 47, is granted. Jeffrey Management Corp shall make its motion no later than September 10, 2021, any response to the motion shall be made no later than September 17, 2021, and any reply shall be made no later than Se ptember 21. Memoranda of law in support and in opposition to the motion shall be no longer than ten double-spaced pages and any reply memorandum of law shall be no longer than five double-spaced pages. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 9/10/2021. Responses due by 9/17/2021. Replies due by 9/21/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 9/3/2021) (va)
|
March 15, 2021 |
Filing
41
DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS denying 34 Motion to Dismiss. DeBon obviously did not take well to Securitas' acquisition of his long-time employer, DSSI. But he remained in the newly-acquired corporations employ , and so owed it a duty of undivided loyalty. The facts pleaded in the complaint, if proven, suggest that he breached that duty in multiple ways, to the detriment of Securitas. His motion to dismiss the complaint is denied. The Clerk is directed to remove the motion at Docket #34 from the court's list of open motions. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/15/2021) (mml)
|
February 26, 2021 |
Filing
40
ORDER denying 38 Letter Motion to Stay re: 38 LETTER MOTION to Stay all Discovery addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from David Halsband dated 02/23/2021. For substantially the reason articulated in the brief filed in opposition to the motion to Dismiss, The complaint is not going to be dismissed. A third opinion will issue in the next few weeks, but you may as well get on with discovery. Stay denied. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/26/2021) (jca)
|
February 18, 2021 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 26 Motion to Quash. For the foregoing reasons, the movant's motion to quash the plaintiff's subpoena, Docket Entry No. 26, is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 2/18/2021) (va)
|
December 23, 2020 |
Filing
30
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/23/2020) (mml)
|