Macklin v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tameake Macklin and Tameake Macklin as Assignee of Happy Child Transportation LLC, All Star Bus Service Co. LLC and Levander Polk
Defendant: Sparta Insurance Company and Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv05372
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 22 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company..(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Brian J. Isaac in Support re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand Case to State Court addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020.FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020.. Document filed by Tameake Macklin, Tameake Macklin as Assignee of Happy Child Transportation LLC, All Star Bus Service Co. LLC and Levander Polk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Internet Search re. Jihan Garces, #2 Exhibit B - Internet Search re. Tanya Kent, #3 Exhibit C - Lexington NY Court Cases, #4 Exhibit D - Internet Search re. Lou Levinson, #5 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Reply, #6 Affidavit of Service).(Isaac, Brian)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIRMATION of John D. McKenna in Opposition re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand Case to State Court addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020.FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020.. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(McKenna, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIRMATION of Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand in Opposition re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand Case to State Court addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020.FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020.. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Jihan E. Garces).(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Koenigsberg on behalf of Tameake Macklin..(Koenigsberg, Paul)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On June 3, 2020, Tameake Macklin ("Plaintiff"), individually and as assignee of Happy Child Transportation LLC, All Star Bus Service Co., LLC, and Levander Polk brought this action against Lexington Insurance Company and Sparta Insurance Company ("Defendants") in the Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Doc. 1-1. Defendants then removed the case to federal court on July 13, 2020 and answered on August 3, 2020. Docs. 1, 13, 14. The Court accepts Plaintiff's motion for remand and directs the Defendants to submit their opposition papers by September 3, 2020, and Plaintiff to submit her reply by September 10, 2020. ( Responses due by 9/3/2020, Replies due by 9/10/2020.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/13/2020) (mro)
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand Case to State Court addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian J. Isaac dated August 12, 2020. Document filed by Tameake Macklin, Tameake Macklin as Assignee of Happy Child Transportation LLC, All Star Bus Service Co. LLC and Levander Polk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Isaac in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B - Lexington Insurance v Ryder Truck Rental Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Lexington Insurance v Werner Enterprises Summons & Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Lexington Insurance v Valley Forge Home Summons & Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Report on Examination of Lexington Insurance Company, #7 Exhibit F - Lexington Insurance v Andek Corporation Summons & Complaint, #8 Exhibit G - Lexington Insurance v Chesley Brown Summons & Complaint, #9 Exhibit H - Lexington Insurance v Eagle Eye Truck Lines Summons & Complaint, #10 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, #11 Affidavit of Service for Motion to Remand, #12 Letter to Hon. Edgardo Ramos).(Isaac, Brian)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on September 17, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone. Counsel should call the Court at (877) 411-9748 and use access code 3029857. PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES IN WRITING AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER, UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Telephone Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos..(ama)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(McKenna, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company..(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty US, Inc., Other Affiliate American International Group Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company..(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J Isaac on behalf of Tameake Macklin, Tameake Macklin as Assignee of Happy Child Transportation LLC, All Star Bus Service Co. LLC and Levander Polk..(Isaac, Brian)
July 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lexington Insurance Company answer due 8/3/2020. (js)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Lexington Insurance Company's request to extend the time to respond to the complaint until August 3, 2020 is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/14/2020) (js)
July 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sparta Insurance Company answer due 8/3/2020. (kv)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SPARTA Insurance Company's request to extend the time to respond to the complaint until August 3, 2020 is granted. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/14/2020) (kv)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint to August 3, 2020 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand dated July 14, 2020. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company..(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to August 3, 2020 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Todd M. Alderman dated July 14, 2020. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(Alderman, Todd)
July 14, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Sparta Insurance Company added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,..(McKenna, John)
July 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John David McKenna re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Tameake Macklin to CM ECF with the party text "as Assignee of Happy Child Transportation LLC, All Star Bus Service Co. LLC, and Levander Polk". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
July 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John David McKenna. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tameake Macklin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Alderman on behalf of Sparta Insurance Company..(Alderman, Todd)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Festa Ahlstrand on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company..(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on Brian J. Isaac and Paul Koenigsberg on July 13, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(McKenna, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Catalina Alpha Ltd., Corporate Parent Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd., Corporate Parent Alea Holdings US Company, Corporate Parent FIN LLC, Corporate Parent Alea Group Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd. for Sparta Insurance Company. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(McKenna, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McKenna, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 652230/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20659902).Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint).(McKenna, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macklin v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameake Macklin
Represented By: Brian J Isaac
Represented By: Paul Koenigsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameake Macklin as Assignee of Happy Child Transportation LLC, All Star Bus Service Co. LLC and Levander Polk
Represented By: Brian J Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparta Insurance Company
Represented By: John David McKenna
Represented By: Todd Alderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Festa Ahlstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?