Spider Labs, Ltd. v. Doe
Plaintiff: SPIDER LABS, LTD.
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2020cv05457
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Status Report filed by Spider Labs, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall submit a status report to the Court once the above-referenced motions to quash are resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/1/2020) (va)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Spider Labs, Ltd...(Nitta, Chad)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Jill Ellen Beathard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Jill E. Beathard, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/28/20) (yv)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Chad Takashi Nitta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Chad T. Nitta, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/28/20) (yv)
July 28, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Jill Ellen Beathard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20868249. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Jill Ellen Beathard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20868249. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Spider Labs, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jill E. Beathard in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Beathard, Jill)
July 27, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Chad Takashi Nitta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20864098. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Chad Takashi Nitta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20864098. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Spider Labs, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Chad T. Nitta in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Nitta, Chad)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Expedite. Accordingly, Spider Labs has demonstrated the need for expedited discovery. Spider Labs' motion to take the expedited discovery requested (dkt. no. 5) is granted, and it may serve Rule 45 subpoenas as requested. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/20/2020) (va)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam Leon Hirsch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Spider Labs, Ltd., John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam Leon Hirsch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Doe..(pne)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery. Document filed by SPIDER LABS, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hirsch, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SPIDER LABS, LTD...(Hirsch, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOHN DOE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SPIDER LABS, LTD...(Hirsch, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hirsch, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20713837)Document filed by SPIDER LABS, LTD...(Hirsch, Adam)
July 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam Leon Hirsch to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 7/21/2020. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spider Labs, Ltd. v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPIDER LABS, LTD.
Represented By: Jill Ellen Beathard
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Represented By: Chad Takashi Nitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?