Zumwalt et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David E. Zumwalt and Kimberly A. Zumwalt
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05461
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/5/2020 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-2859-PAC. Document filed by David E. Zumwalt, Kimberly A. Zumwalt..(Straka, Heath)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Straka, Heath)
July 20, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 20, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc..(jgo)
July 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Heath P. Straka. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Heath P. Straka. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Heath P. Straka to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; the incorrect Earlier Filed case number is on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Heath P. Straka to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF must be filed separately; Jury Demand code was not selected; Courthouse Assignment was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Heath P. Straka to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2589. Document filed by David E. Zumwalt, Kimberly A. Zumwalt..(Straka, Heath) Modified on 7/17/2020 (jgo).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David E. Zumwalt, Kimberly A. Zumwalt..(Straka, Heath)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David E. Zumwalt, Kimberly A. Zumwalt..(Straka, Heath)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David E. Zumwalt, Kimberly A. Zumwalt..(Straka, Heath)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20712264)Document filed by David E. Zumwalt, Kimberly A. Zumwalt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Straka, Heath) Modified on 7/17/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zumwalt et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Zumwalt
Represented By: Heath P. Straka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A. Zumwalt
Represented By: Heath P. Straka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?