Nicholas K., Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Nicholas K., Inc.
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05465
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Marc Cieri on behalf of Nicholas K., Inc...(Cieri, Jason)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J'Naia Boyd on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd...(Boyd, J'Naia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service).(Bank, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Laurence Bank. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code b (Both); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal with Exhibits A and B, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement served on Nicholas K, Inc. on 07/16/2020. Document filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd...(Bank, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd...(Bank, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bank, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654344/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20713878).Document filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New York County Summons, Complaint and Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories).(Bank, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas K., Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas K., Inc.
Represented By: Jason Marc Cieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian Laurence Bank
Represented By: J'Naia Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?