Basurto et al v. Tacos El Paisa Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amelia Basurto
Defendant: Tacos El Paisa Inc. doing business as Tacos El Paisa and Blanca Serrano
Case Number: 1:2020cv05483
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM through remote conference.(ah)
August 31, 2020 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/30/2020..(rpr)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/8/2020. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Blanca Serrano, Tacos El Paisa Inc...(Dawson, Eric)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tacos El Paisa Inc...(Dawson, Eric)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Blanca Serrano served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. Service was accepted by John Doe, Authorized to accept. Document filed by Amelia Basurto(Individually ); Amelia Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Tacos El Paisa Inc. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the secretary of State. Document filed by Amelia Basurto(Individually ); Amelia Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tacos El Paisa Inc...(pc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blanca Serrano..(pc)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clifford Ryan Tucker on behalf of Amelia Basurto(Individually ), Amelia Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Tucker, Clifford)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Blanca Serrano, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amelia Basurto(Individually ), Amelia Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tacos El Paisa Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amelia Basurto(Individually ), Amelia Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blanca Serrano, Tacos El Paisa Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20719625)Document filed by Amelia Basurto(Individually ), Amelia Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basurto et al v. Tacos El Paisa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacos El Paisa Inc. doing business as Tacos El Paisa
Represented By: Eric Peter Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Serrano
Represented By: Eric Peter Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Basurto
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?