Rosario v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gloria Maria Rosario
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv05490
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristina Danielle Cohn on behalf of Social Security Administration..(Cohn, Kristina)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. Document filed by Gloria Maria Rosario. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 10/26/2020..(Spadafore, Michelle)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Standing Order No. 16-MC-00171, dated April 20, 2016 (Standing Order), defendant shall file the electronic certified transcript of the administrative proceedings (e-CAR), which shall constitute the defendant's answer, no later than 90 days after defendant was served with process in this action. Thereafter, in order to promote the efficient adjudication of this matter, Judge Moses expects the parties to adhere to the following schedule and comply with the following procedures as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 7/22/20) (yv)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul..(gp)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/20/2020) (ks)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/20/2020) (ks)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pne)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gloria Maria Rosario..(Spadafore, Michelle)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Gloria Maria Rosario..(Spadafore, Michelle)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spadafore, Michelle)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Document filed by Gloria Maria Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC decision).(Spadafore, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Maria Rosario
Represented By: Michelle Marie Spadafore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Kristina Danielle Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?