Texcahau Cerezo et al v. 53 West 72nd Street Cafe LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Texcahau Cerezo
Defendant: Manjit Singh, Jennifer Klein, Lakhvir Singh, Phuman Singh and 53 West 72nd Street Cafe LLC doing business as The Dakota Bar
Case Number: 1:2020cv05492
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Manjit Singh served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service was accepted by Mr. Raj, Co-worker. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually); Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Phuman Singh served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service was accepted by Mr. Raj, Co-worker. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually); Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Lakhvir Singh served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service was accepted by Mr. Raj, Co-worker. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually); Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer Klein..(dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennifer Klein, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually), Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lakhvir Singh..(pne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manjit Singh..(pne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phuman Singh..(pne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 53 West 72nd Street Cafe LLC..(pne)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse S Barton on behalf of Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually), Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Barton, Jesse)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lakhvir Singh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually), Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manjit Singh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually), Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phuman Singh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually), Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 53 West 72nd Street Cafe LLC (d/b/a The Dakota Bar), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually), Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 53 West 72nd Street Cafe LLC, Jennifer Klein, Lakhvir Singh, Manjit Singh, Phuman Singh. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20722019)Document filed by Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(individually), Daniel Texcahau Cerezo(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texcahau Cerezo et al v. 53 West 72nd Street Cafe LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manjit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakhvir Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phuman Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 53 West 72nd Street Cafe LLC doing business as The Dakota Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Texcahau Cerezo
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?