Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc. v. Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC.
Petitioner: Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc.
Respondent: Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05493
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:5
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter appointment of arbitrator., filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Respondent is hereby ORDERED to respond to the Petition for Appointment of an Arbitrator by no later than September 25, 2020. Failure to do so will result in the Petition being deemed unopposed. Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to serve this Memo Endorsement on Respondent. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 9/25/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/11/20) (yv)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian P. Maloney dated September 9, 2020 re: appointment of arbitrator. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) 7/31/20 Letter and Attachments).(Maloney, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of / Affidavit of Attempted Service on July 24, 2020 served on Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC. on July 24, 2020. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of / Affidavit of Attempted Service on July 20, 2020 served on Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC. on July 20, 2020. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Notice of Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator, Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator, Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator, Declaration of Brian P. Maloney in Support of Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance of Brian P. Maloney, Notice of Appearance of James W. Hurder, Individual Practices in Civil Cases of Judge Alison J. Nathan, Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions, Letter Dated 7/31/2020, Order, and Individual Practices in Civil Cases of Judge Alison J. Nathan served on Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC. on August 12, 2020. Service was accepted by Dyvette P. Fong. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. On July 16, 2020, Petitioner Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc. filed a Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator. Dkt. No. 1. Petitioner shall file proof of service within one week from the date of service on Respondent Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC. It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent's opposition to the Petition shall be due three weeks from the date of service. Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be due one week thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner serve a copy of this Order on Respondent and inform Respondent of Rule 1.I of this Court's Individual Practices, which requires all attorneys representing parties before this Court to register promptly as filing users on ECF. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and advise the court, by filing a letter motion on ECF, if they believe that holding a conference would be appropriate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/31/2020) (rjm)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC...(pne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James W. Hurder on behalf of Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Hurder, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Paul Maloney on behalf of Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
July 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Paul Maloney. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $225,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Appoint Arbitrator. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sargeant Marine, Inc. for Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc.. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Maloney, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Brian P. Maloney in Support re: #2 MOTION to Appoint Arbitrator(s) Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc./ Notice of Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator.. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Maloney, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2 MOTION to Appoint Arbitrator(s) Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc./ Notice of Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator. . Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Arbitrator(s) Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc./ Notice of Petition for the Appointment of an Arbitrator. Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO APPOINT ARBITRATOR. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20722922).Document filed by Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc...(Maloney, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc. v. Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maui Asphalt X-IV, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sargeant Bulk Asphalt, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Paul Maloney
Represented By: James W. Hurder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?