Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hu
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: David Hu
Case Number: 1:2020cv05496
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Thomas Mitchell on behalf of David Hu..(Mitchell, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Schiffman on behalf of David Hu..(Schiffman, Howard)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Hu waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Fortino, Philip)
July 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 21, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-10796-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-10796. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Michael, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 19-cv-10796. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Michael. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Daniel Michael, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Senechal Moilanen on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Moilanen, Lindsay)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Andrew Fortino on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Fortino, Philip)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Michael, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Hu. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Michael, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hu
Represented By: Jason Thomas Mitchell
Represented By: Howard Schiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Lindsay Senechal Moilanen
Represented By: Daniel Michael
Represented By: Philip Andrew Fortino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?