New York Yankees Partnership et al v. Hass
Petitioner: New York Yankees Partnership and Legends Hospitality LLC
Respondent: Walter Hass
Case Number: 1:2020cv05499
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Walter Hass served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service was accepted by WALTER HASS - DEFENDANT. Document filed by New York Yankees Partnership; Legends Hospitality LLC..(Touhey, John)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walter Hass..(dnh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walter Hass, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Legends Hospitality LLC, New York Yankees Partnership..(Touhey, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Touhey, John)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John P. Touhey to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name must be listed on 'as to' docket entry text;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John P. Touhey. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York Yankees Partnership; Legends Hospitality LLC; Walter Hass. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John P. Touhey. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $626,705,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John P. Touhey to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Support of Petition. Document filed by Legends Hospitality LLC, New York Yankees Partnership..(Touhey, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Legends Hospitality LLC, New York Yankees Partnership..(Touhey, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Touhey, John) Modified on 7/20/2020 (jgo).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Legends Hospitality LLC, New York Yankees Partnership..(Touhey, John) Modified on 7/20/2020 (jgo).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20733659).Document filed by New York Yankees Partnership, Legends Hospitality LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Motion for Award of Judgment, #3 Exhibit Proposed Judgment).(Touhey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Yankees Partnership et al v. Hass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walter Hass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York Yankees Partnership
Represented By: John P. Touhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Legends Hospitality LLC
Represented By: John P. Touhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?