Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Novartis Pharma AG et al
Plaintiff: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Vetter Pharma International GMBH, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC and Novartis Pharma AG
Case Number: 1:2020cv05502
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 AMENDED MOTION for Julianne M. Hartzell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 44 AMENDED MOTION for Julianne M. Hartzell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vetter Pharma International GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Julianne M. Hartzell In Support of Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Hartzell, Julianne)
September 4, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Transfer Case ., MOTION to Stay (Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay). Document filed by Vetter Pharma International GMBH..(Horton, Benjamin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Ian Simmons in Support re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Transfer Case or. MOTION to Stay (Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay).. Document filed by Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Novartis's complaint against Regeneron in Novartis Pharma AG v. Regeneron Pharm., Inc., No. 1:20-cv-00690-TJM-CFH (N.D.N.Y.), #2 Exhibit 2 - Novartis's Complaint against Regeneron in the International Trade Commission, #3 Exhibit 3 - Regeneron's Response to the Complaint and Notice of Investigation in the International Trade Commission, #4 Exhibit 4 - Regeneron's Motion to Stay Novartis Pharma AG v. Regeneron Pharm., Inc., No. 1:20-cv-00690-TJM-CFH (N.D.N.Y.), #5 Exhibit 5 - Copy of the article Regeneron Will Spend up to $620 Million in Capital Expenditure This Year, published in the Albany Business Review on Feb. 24, 2020).(Simmons, Ian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Transfer Case or. MOTION to Stay (Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay). . Document filed by Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC..(Simmons, Ian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Transfer Case or., MOTION to Stay (Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay). Document filed by Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC..(Simmons, Ian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC. Document filed by Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC..(Simmons, Ian)
September 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #34 MOTION for Julianne M. Hartzell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21483271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Benjamin T. Horton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Ian Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
September 3, 2020 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Julianne M. Hartzell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21483271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vetter Pharma International GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hartzell, Julianne) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bcu).
September 3, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Benjamin T. Horton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21481872. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. The applicant states in the affidavit due to COVID-19, cannot obtain Certificates of Good Standing within the required time frame. The applicant must submit Certificate from Illinois once received. (aea)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Benjamin T. Horton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21481872. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vetter Pharma International GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Benjamin T. Horton, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Horton, Benjamin)
August 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21301391. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #31 MOTION for Ian Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21302200. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #32 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21303290. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 24, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21303290. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Bradshaw, Benjamin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Ian Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21302200. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #3 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Simmons, Ian)
August 24, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21301391. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(McIntyre, Stephen)
August 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Edward Ferguson on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Ferguson, Brian)
August 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Novartis Pharma AG answer due 10/19/2020; Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation answer due 10/19/2020; Novartis Technology LLC answer due 10/19/2020; Vetter Pharma International GMBH answer due 10/19/2020. (ks)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/4/2020) (ks)
August 3, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Eric S. Hochstadt dated August 3, 2020. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Hochstadt, Eric)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Steven Newborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Michael R. Moiseyev to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Anish R. Desai to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/29/2020) (rjm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Tori Evans on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Evans, James)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Petra Scamborova on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Scamborova, Petra)
July 27, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Steven Newborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20862239. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #16 MOTION for Michael R. Moiseyev to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20861978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Novartis Technology LLC waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Novartis Pharma AG waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Steven Newborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20862239. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven Newborn, #2 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 New York State Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Newborn, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Michael R. Moiseyev to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20861978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael R. Moiseyev, #2 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Moiseyev, Michael)
July 27, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Anish R. Desai to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20861387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Anish R. Desai to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20861387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anish R. Desai, #2 New York State Certificate of Good Standing, #3 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Desai, Anish)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Vetter Pharma International GMBH served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Service was accepted by Tracie Blaskie. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vetter Pharma International GMBH..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Novartis Technology LLC..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Novartis Pharma AG..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Shaun Hochstadt on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Hochstadt, Eric)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth S. Weiswasser on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vetter Pharma International GMBH, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Novartis Technology LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Novartis Pharma AG, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Statement).(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Technology LLC, Vetter Pharma International GMBH. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20733541)Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc...(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Novartis Pharma AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vetter Pharma International GMBH
Represented By: Benjamin T Horton
Represented By: Julianne Marie Hartzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Represented By: Ian Thomas Simmons
Represented By: Benjamin Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Technology LLC
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Represented By: Ian Thomas Simmons
Represented By: Benjamin Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharma AG
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Represented By: Ian Thomas Simmons
Represented By: Benjamin Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Weiswasser
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Anish R Desai
Represented By: Petra Scamborova
Represented By: Steven A. Newborn
Represented By: Michael Moiseyev
Represented By: James Tori Evans
Represented By: Brian Edward Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?